Osborn et al v. American Licorice Co
Plaintiff: Greg Osborn and Adam Vigil
Defendant: American Licorice Co
Case Number: 3:2023cv00119
Filed: February 13, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Damon R Leichty
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE by Greg Osborn, Adam Vigil of Filing Consent to Join Form Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. 216(b) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent Form (Luke Pardue))(Baishnab, Robi)
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: This Court DENIES WITHOUT PREJUDICE the instant motion #8 . The parties may resubmit a motion for protective order with a proposed protective order drafted in compliance with the standards set forth in this order and the citations herein. A protective order template, consistent with Seventh Circuit authority, is available at https://www.innd.uscourts.gov/judges-info/MGG. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 4/11/2023. (shk)
March 27, 2023 Filing 8 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Plaintiffs Greg Osborn, Adam Vigil. (Baishnab, Robi)
March 27, 2023 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Greg Osborn, Adam Vigil. American Licorice Co waiver sent on 3/24/2023, answer due 5/23/2023. (Baishnab, Robi)
March 13, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE by Greg Osborn, Adam Vigil of Filing Consent to Join Form Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. 216(b) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent Form)(Baishnab, Robi)
March 3, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE by Greg Osborn, Adam Vigil of Filing Consent to Join Form Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. 216(b) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent Form)(Baishnab, Robi)
March 2, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE by Greg Osborn, Adam Vigil of Filing Consent to Join Forms Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. 216(b) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent Forms)(Baishnab, Robi)
February 17, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE by Greg Osborn of Filing Consent to Join Form Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. 216(b) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent Form)(Baishnab, Robi)
February 14, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to American Licorice Co. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (kmt)
February 14, 2023 **NEW CASE** Judge Damon R Leichty and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (kmt)
February 13, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against American Licorice Co( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AINNDC-5159500.), filed by Greg Osborn, Adam Vigil. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent Forms, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(Baishnab, Robi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Osborn et al v. American Licorice Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg Osborn
Represented By: Robi J Baishnab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Vigil
Represented By: Robi J Baishnab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Licorice Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?