Scarpinato v. Galipeau et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Lee Scarpinato
Defendant: John Galipeau, Hicks and Sonnenberg
Not Classified By Court: WESTVILLE E-FILE(Court Use Only)
Case Number: 3:2023cv00121
Filed: February 13, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jon E DeGuilio
Referring Judge: John E Martin
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DENYING as unnecessary #7 Motion to Extend or Enlarge Time to file an Amended Complaint re #1 Pro Se Complaint by Plaintiff Daniel Lee Scarpinato. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 4/4/2023. (mrm)
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Extend or Enlarge Time to file an Amended Complaint re #1 Pro Se Complaint by Plaintiff Daniel Lee Scarpinato. (kmt)
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Consent to Receipt of Documents Through Prisoner Electronic Filing Program by Daniel Lee Scarpinato. The Prisoner Electronic Filing Program operates pursuant to General Order 2018-1. When an inmate submits a document for electronic filing, the Prison Law Library emails a scanned copy and mails the original to the Court. The inmate should not mail a paper copy to the Court or a Defendant. When the scanned copy is docketed by the Court, a Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) is emailed to the Prison Law Library. This NEF is printed by the Prison Law Library and given to the inmate with only the first page of the inmate's filing. Defendants are served by the Court. When the Prison Law Library receives an NEF for an entry by the Court, the NEF and a full copy of any attached order or document is printed and given to the inmate. The Prison Law Library will not print the NEF for documents filed by a Defendant. The Defendant must serve the inmate by mail. (kmt)
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 OPINION AND ORDER denying Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction #3 . Signed by Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 3/2/2023. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (rmf)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The court GRANTS the plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis #2 ; ORDERS the plaintiff, Daniel Lee Scarpinato, IDOC # 179508, to immediately pay (and the facility having custody to automatically remit) $5.00 to the clerk in payment of the initial partial filing fee; ORDERS the plaintiff to pay (and the facility having custody to automatically remit) to the clerk 20% of the money received for each calendar month during which $10.00 or more is received, until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full; DIRECTS the clerk to create a ledger for receipt of these funds; and DIRECTS the clerk to send a copy of this order to each facility where the plaintiff is housed until the filing fee has been paid in full. Signed by Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 02/14/2023. (Copy mailed as directed in Order) (jdb)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Daniel Lee Scarpinato. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit on Motion for Preliminary Injunction: Affidavit of Daniel Lee Scarpinato)(kmt)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Daniel Lee Scarpinato. (kmt)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT against John Galipeau, Hicks, Sonnenberg, filed by Daniel Lee Scarpinato. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(File stamped copy with case number sent to Scarpinato)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scarpinato v. Galipeau et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Lee Scarpinato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Galipeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonnenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: WESTVILLE E-FILE(Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?