Knighten v. Marthakis et al
Plaintiff: Undray Knighten
Defendant: Nancy Marthakis and Centurion Medical
Case Number: 3:2023cv00213
Filed: March 14, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jon E DeGuilio
Referring Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 and #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The court ORDERS the plaintiff, Undray Knighten, IDOC # 111206, to immediately pay (and the facility having custody to automatically remit) $12.82 to the clerk in payment of the initial partial filing fee, ORDERS the plaintiff to pay (and the facility having custody to automatically remit) to the clerk 20% of the money received for each calendar month during which $10.00 or more is received, until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full, DIRECTS the clerk to create a ledger for receipt of these funds and DIRECTS the clerk to send a copy of this order to each facility where the plaintiff is housed until the filing fee has been paid in full. Signed by Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 4/3/23. (Copy mailed as directed in Order). (nal)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RESPONSE to #5 Order with Inmate Trust Fund Ledger, by Undray Knighten. (kmt)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order ***Deficiency Deadline terminated. (kmt)
March 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER, Undray Knighten is GRANTED until April 21, 2023, to file a copy of his inmate trust fund ledger detailing his transactions for the past six months. He is CAUTIONED, if he does not respond by the deadline, this case may be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 3/21/23. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(mlc)
March 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: This complaint is related to pending matters in cause numbers 3:21-CV-64 and 3:22-CV-456, which are currently before the Honorable Jon E. DeGuilio. Under Local Rule 40-1, [w]hen the court determines that two cases are related, the case filed later must be transferred to the judge handling the earlier filed case. N.D. Ind. L.R. 40-1(e). Accordingly, the court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to TRANSFER this case to the Honorable Jon E. DeGuilio. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio for all further proceedings. Judge Robert L Miller, Jr no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/15/2023. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(kmt)
March 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Undray Knighten. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, #2 Declaration in Support, #3 Notice of Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, #4 Incomplete Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons)(kmt)
March 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RECEIPT of blank Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis from Undray Knighten. (Attachments: #1 Blank Inmate Trust Fund Account Statement, #2 Blank Affidavit of Special Circumstances)(kmt)
March 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT against Centurion Medical, Nancy Marthakis, filed by Undray Knighten. (Attachments: #1 Blank Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons)(File stamped copy with case number sent to Knighten)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knighten v. Marthakis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Undray Knighten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Marthakis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centurion Medical
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?