Parker v. Marthakis et al
Plaintiff: Tyrone Parker
Defendant: Nancy Marthakis and Christiana Chico
Case Number: 3:2023cv00698
Filed: July 19, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Holly A Brady
Referring Judge: Susan L Collins
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2023 Opinion or Order ***Waiver of Service Deadline terminated pursuant to #11 . (nhc)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Carol A Dillon on behalf of Nancy Marthakis (Dillon, Carol)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Nancy Marthakis. Nancy Marthakis waiver sent on 8/2/2023, answer due 10/2/2023. (Andreas, Austin)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Austin R Andreas on behalf of Nancy Marthakis (Andreas, Austin)
August 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons sent to Dr. Nancy Marthakis. Waiver of Service due by 9/1/2023. (Attachments: #1 Opinion and Order, #2 Complaint with Exhibits) (mrm)
August 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 OPINION AND ORDER: The Court GRANTS the plaintiff leave to proceed against Dr. Nancy Marthakis in her individual capacity for money damages for failing to provide him constitutionally adequate medical care by not monitoring his sodium levels, resulting in him having a severe adverse reaction to a medication she prescribed in August 2021; DISMISSES Christiana Chico as a defendant; DISMISSES all other claims; DIRECTS the clerk to request a Waiver of Service from (and if necessary, the United States Marshals Service to use any lawful means to locate and serve process on) Dr. Nancy Marthakis at Centurion Health and to send her a copy of this order and the amended complaint (ECF #4 ) pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(d); ORDERS Centurion Health to provide the United States Marshal Service with the full name, date of birth, and last known home address of any defendant who does not waive service, to the extent this information is available; and ORDERS Dr. Nancy Marthakis to respond, as provided in the Federal Rules ofCivil Procedure and N.D. Ind. L.R. 10-1(b), only to the claim for which the plaintiff has been granted leave to proceed in this screening order. Signed by Chief Judge Holly A Brady on 8/1/2023. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(mrm)
July 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The court GRANTS the plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis #2 ; WAIVES the initial partial filing fee; ORDERS the plaintiff, Tyrone Parker, IDOC # 13112, to pay (and the facility having custody to automatically remit) to the clerk 20% of the money received for each calendar month during which $10.00 or more is received, until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full; DIRECTS the clerk to create a ledger for receipt of these funds; and DIRECTS the clerk to send a copy of this order to each facility where the plaintiff is housed until the filing fee has been paid in full. Signed by Chief Judge Holly A Brady on 07/27/2023. (Copy mailed as directed in Order) (jdb)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RECEIPT of duplicate copy of DE #3 from Tyrone Parker. (File stamped 7/21/2023 by ISP, e-file not received by court. Paper copy scanned 7/26/2023) (kmt)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RECEIPT of duplicate copy of DE #2 from Tyrone Parker. (File stamped 7/21/2023 by ISP, e-file not received by court. Paper copy scanned 7/26/2023) (kmt)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Christiana Chico, Nancy Marthakis, filed by Tyrone Parker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(File stamped 7/21/2023 by ISP, e-file not received by court. Paper copy scanned 7/26/2023)(kmt)
July 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Plaintiff Tyrone Parker. (File stamped 7/19/2023 by ISP, e-file not received by court. Paper copy scanned 7/24/2023) (kmt)
July 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Prisoner Trust Account Ledger attached) by Plaintiff Tyrone Parker. (File stamped 7/19/2023 by ISP, e-file not received by court. Paper copy scanned 7/24/2023) (kmt)
July 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT against Christiana Chico, Nancy Marthakis, filed by Tyrone Parker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (File stamped 7/19/2023 by ISP, e-file not received by court. Paper copy scanned 7/24/2023)(File stamped copy with case number sent to Parker)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker v. Marthakis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyrone Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Marthakis
Represented By: Austin R Andreas
Represented By: Carol A Dillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christiana Chico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?