Chairez v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Michelle Chairez
Defendant: Commissioner of SSA Martin J O'Malley and Commissioner of Social Security
Not Yet Classified: General Counsel SSA (Court use only)
Case Number: 3:2024cv00020
Filed: January 9, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Theresa L Springmann
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 416 Denial of Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Norris, Lindsay)
March 8, 2024 Filing 7 SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by Commissioner of Social Security. (Norris, Lindsay)
March 8, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay Norris on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Norris, Lindsay)
January 12, 2024 Filing 5 Notice of Commencement of Social Security Appeal action ( #1 Complaint) sent to the Commissioner of Social Security. Commissioner of Social Security Answer or Motion due 3/12/2024. Pursuant to General Order #2022-20, the briefing schedule is as follows: The plaintiff's opening brief must be filed within 42 days after the answer is filed or 42 days after entry of an order disposing of the last remaining motion under Rule 4(c) of the Supplemental Rules, whichever is later. The Commissioner's response brief must be filed 42 days after service of the opening brief. Any reply brief must be filed 14 days after service of the response brief. (shk)
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The Court gRANTS the Plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 ; WAIVES payment of the filing fee; and DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to docket a Notice of Commencement of Social Security Appeal Action. Signed by Judge Theresa L Springmann on 1/12/2024. (shk)
January 10, 2024 **NEW CASE, MOTION PENDING** Judge Theresa L Springmann and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (shk)
January 9, 2024 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Michelle Chairez. (Forbes, Rodney)
January 9, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Rodney E Forbes on behalf of Michelle Chairez (Forbes, Rodney)
January 9, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Martin J O'Malley, filed by Michelle Chairez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Forbes, Rodney)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chairez v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Chairez
Represented By: Rodney E Forbes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of SSA Martin J O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Lindsay Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: General Counsel SSA (Court use only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?