Techniplas, Inc. v. Nyamagaju
Defendant: Jeanne Nyamagaju
Petitioner: Techniplas, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2024cv00113
Filed: February 5, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Damon R Leichty
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 1 U.S. Arbitration Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The Court ORDERS Techniplas to file an amended petition that substantiates subject matter jurisdiction and is complete by 4/10/2024. Signed by Judge Damon R Leichty on 3/27/2024. (mrm)
February 26, 2024 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Petition with Ex. A, Summons, and Civil Cover Sheet by Process Server served on Defendant on February 24, 2024, filed by Techniplas, Inc.. (Bell, Steven)
February 6, 2024 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Jeanne Nyamagaju. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (ash)
February 6, 2024 Judge Damon R Leichty and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. **NEW CASE** (ash)
February 5, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT To Confirm Arbitration Award against Jeanne Nyamagaju( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AINNDC-5482280.), filed by Techniplas, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Arb. Agreement, #2 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Inabnit, Brent)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Techniplas, Inc. v. Nyamagaju
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Techniplas, Inc.
Represented By: Brent E Inabnit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeanne Nyamagaju
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?