Williams v. Morales
Plaintiff: Billy Williams
Defendant: Morales
Not Yet Classified: INDIANA STATE PRISON E-FILE (Court Use Only)
Case Number: 3:2024cv00357
Filed: May 2, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: John E Martin
Referring Judge: Theresa L Springmann
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; ORDERS the Plaintiff, Billy Williams, IDOC # 988757, to immediately pay (and the facility having custody to automatically remit) $24.80 to the Clerk of Court in payment of the initial partial filing fee; ORDERS the Plaintiff to pay (and the facility having custody to automatically remit) to the Clerk of Court 20% of the money received for each calendar month during which $10.00 or more is received, until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full; DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to create a ledger for receipt of these funds; and DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to send a copy of this order to each facility where the Plaintiff is housed until the filing fee has been paid in full. Signed by Judge Theresa L Springmann on 6/11/24. (Copy mailed to Indiana State Prison as directed in Order). (nhc)
June 5, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Prisoner Trust Account Ledger attached) by Plaintiff Billy Williams. (kmt)
June 5, 2024 ***Deficiency Deadline terminated. (kmt)
May 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DENYING #3 Petition to Proceed in forma pauperis by Pla Billy Williams; DIRECTING Clerk to place this cause number on a blank prisoner in forma pauperis petition and send it to Pla; GRANTING Pla until 6/5/2024, to either pay the filing fee or submit a properly completed prisoner in forma pauperis petition with a current copy of his inmate trust account ledger; and CAUTIONING Pla that, if he does not respond by that deadline, this case will be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Judge Theresa L Springmann on 5/3/2024. (Attachments: #1 Prisoner In Forma Pauperis Motion)(lns)
May 2, 2024 Filing 4 Copy of docket sheet and complaint to be distributed to Billy Williams 988757. (nae)
May 2, 2024 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Prisoner Trust Account Ledger attached) by Plaintiff Billy Williams. (nae)
May 2, 2024 Filing 2 PRO SE COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Morales, filed by Billy Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(nae)
May 2, 2024 Filing 1 Consent to Receipt of Documents Through Prisoner Electronic Filing Program by Billy Williams. The Prisoner Electronic Filing Program operates pursuant to General Order 2018-1. When an inmate submits a document for electronic filing, the Prison Law Library emails a scanned copy and mails the original to the Court. The inmate should not mail a paper copy to the Court or a Defendant. When the scanned copy is docketed by the Court, a Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) is emailed to the Prison Law Library. This NEF is printed by the Prison Law Library and given to the inmate with only the first page of the inmate's filing. Defendants are served by the Court. When the Prison Law Library receives an NEF for an entry by the Court, the NEF and a full copy of any attached order or document is printed and given to the inmate. The Prison Law Library will not print the NEF for documents filed by a Defendant. The Defendant must serve the inmate by mail. (nae)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: INDIANA STATE PRISON E-FILE (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?