Burton v. St Joseph County Jail et al
Plaintiff: Frederick James Burton
Defendant: St Joseph County Sheriff Department and Armark
Case Number: 3:2024cv00392
Filed: May 16, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Rodovich
Referring Judge: Theresa L Springmann
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Armark, St Joseph County Sheriff Department, filed by Frederick James Burton. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ash)
June 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Armark, St Joseph County Sheriff Department, filed by Frederick James Burton.(kmt)
June 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DENYING #8 Letter/Request to amend, filed by Frederick James Burton. REMINDING Frederick James Burton that he has until 7/2/2023, to file a properly completed amended complaint; and CAUTIONING Frederick James Burton that, if he does not respond by the deadline, this case will be dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A without further notice because the current complaint does not state a claim for which relief can be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 6/12/2024.(Copy mailed to pro se party)(mrm)
June 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Letter requesting to amend complaint from Frederick Burton (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (list of grievances), #2 Page one of proposed Amended Complaint, #3 Envelope) (nae)
June 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The court DIRECTS the clerk to place this cause number on a blank Prisoner Complaint form and send it to Frederick James Burton; REMINDS the Frederick James Burton that he has until 7/2/2024, to file a properly completed amended complaint; and CAUTIONS Frederick James Burton that, if he does not respond by the deadline, this case will be dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A without further notice because the current complaint does not state a claim for which relief can be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 6/6/2024. (Copy mailed as directed in Order). (nhc)
June 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RECEIPT of Prisoner Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis from Frederick James Burton.(Previously granted pursuant to DE #3 ) (kmt)
June 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Letter from Frederick James Burton regarding Amended Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Page 3 of Complaint, #2 Envelope) (kmt)
June 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 OPINION AND ORDER: The Court GRANTS Frederick James Burton until 7/2/2024, to file an amended complaint; and CAUTIONS Frederick James Burton that, if he does not respond by the deadline, this case will be dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A without further notice because the current complaint does not state a claim for which relief can be granted. Signed by Judge Theresa L Springmann on 6/4/2024. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(ash)
June 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; WAIVES the initial partial filing fee; ORDERS the Plaintiff, Frederick James Burton, IDOC # 218077, St. Joseph County Jail # 87859, to pay (and the facility having custody to automatically remit) to the Clerk of Court 20% of the money received for each calendar month during which $10.00 or more is received, until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full; DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to create a ledger for receipt of these funds; and DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to send a copy of this order to each facility where the Plaintiff is housed until the filing fee has been paid in full. Signed by Judge Theresa L Springmann on 6/3/24. (Copy mailed to pro se party and St. Joseph County Jail as directed in Order). (nhc)
May 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Prisoner Trust Account Ledger attached) by Plaintiff Frederick James Burton. (nae)
May 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT against Armark, St Joseph County Jail, filed by Frederick James Burton. (Returned file stamped copy with case number to plaintiff) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope)(nae)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burton v. St Joseph County Jail et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick James Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St Joseph County Sheriff Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?