Eason v. Warden
Petitioner: Mark A Eason, Jr. and Mark Aaron Eason, Jr
Respondent: Warden
Case Number: 3:2024cv00558
Filed: July 1, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Joseph S Van Bokkelen
Referring Judge: Abizer Zanzi
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AMENDED PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5.00 paid), filed by Mark A Eason, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(ash)
August 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Filing Fee Received: $ 5.00, receipt number FTW1860 (ash)
August 12, 2024 Opinion or Order ***Amended Pleading Deadline terminated per DE #6 . (ash)
July 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The Court GRANTS Mark A. Eason, Jr., until 8/9/2024, to file an amended petition or a motion to stay consistent with this order; and CAUTIONS Mark A. Eason, Jr., that, if he does not respond by this deadline, this case will be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen on 7/10/24. (Copy mailed to pro se party). (nhc)
July 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The Clerk is DIRECTED to close case #1:24-CV-263 and open a new case with these filings in the South Bend Division with the same judges. Signed by Magistrate Judge Abizer Zanzi on 7/8/2024. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(mrm)
July 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Prisoner Trust Account Ledger attached) by Petitioner Mark A Eason, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Ledger, #2 Envelope)(mrm)
July 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Mark A Eason, Jr. (Returned copy with case number to petitioner) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mrm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eason v. Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mark A Eason, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mark Aaron Eason, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?