Hale v. Smiley et al
Plaintiff: Alex L Hale
Defendant: Jason Smiley, Shannon Smith, Burkett, Rekitzke, Tracy Cornett, Cornett, Rippe, Due, Vazques and Williams
Unknown: WESTVILLE E-FILE(Court Use Only)
Case Number: 3:2025cv00067
Filed: January 21, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Gretchen S Lund
Referring Judge: John E Martin
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 12 OPINION AND ORDER DENYING #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Alex L Hale as outlined. GRANTING Alex L. Hale until 4/15/2025, to file an amended complaint and CAUTIONING him that, if he does not respond by the deadline, this case will be dismissed under 28 U.S.C. 1915A without further notice because the current complaint does not state a claim for which relief can be granted. Signed by Judge Gretchen S Lund on 3/12/2025. (mrm)
March 7, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Alex L Hale. (nae)
February 26, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Receipt of duplicate copy of DE #7 Motion to Amend Complaint by Plaintiff Alex L Hale. (kmt) Modified on 2/28/2025 (kmt).
February 19, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: For reasons stated in the Order, the Court DENIES the motion to amend DE #7 . Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 2/19/2025. (ely)
February 19, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The Court GRANTS the plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis ECF #2 ; ECF #6 ; ORDERS the plaintiff, Alex L. Hale, IDOC # 200980, to immediately pay (and the facility having custody to automatically remit) $46.12 to the clerk in payment of the initial partial filing fee; ORDERS the plaintiff to pay (and the facility having custody to automatically remit) to the clerk 20% of the money received for each calendar month during which $10.00 or more is received, until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full; DIRECTS the clerk to create a ledger for receipt of these funds; and DIRECTS the clerk to send a copy of this order to each facility where the plaintiff is housed until the filing fee has been paid in full. Signed by Judge Gretchen S Lund on 2/19/2025. (Copy mailed to Westville Correctional Facility)(ely)
February 13, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Amend #1 Pro Se Complaint by Plaintiff Alex L Hale. (nae)
February 13, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RESPONSE to #3 Order by Alex L Hale. (Attachments: #1 Inmate Trust Fund Ledger)(nae)
February 13, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RECEIPT of consent to e-file (previously received) from Alex L Hale. (nae)
February 13, 2025 Opinion or Order ***Deficiency Deadline terminated. (nae)
February 6, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Consent to Receipt of Documents Through Prisoner Electronic Filing Program by Alex L Hale. The Prisoner Electronic Filing Program operates pursuant to General Order 2018-1. When an inmate submits a document for electronic filing, the Prison Law Library emails a scanned copy and mails the original to the Court. The inmate should not mail a paper copy to the Court or a Defendant. When the scanned copy is docketed by the Court, a Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) is emailed to the Prison Law Library. This NEF is printed by the Prison Law Library and given to the inmate with only the first page of the inmate's filing. Defendants are served by the Court. When the Prison Law Library receives an NEF for an entry by the Court, the NEF and a full copy of any attached order or document is printed and given to the inmate. The Prison Law Library will not print the NEF for documents filed by a Defendant. The Defendant must serve the inmate by mail. (kmt)
January 28, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The Court GRANTS Alex L Hale until 2/28/2025, to respond to this order and CAUTIONS him that if he does not respond by the deadline, this case may be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 1/28/2025. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(ely)
January 21, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Alex L Hale. (kmt)
January 21, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT against Burkett, Cornett, Tracy Cornett, Due, Rekitzke, Rippe, Jason Smiley, Shannon Smith, Vazques, Williams, filed by Alex L Hale. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(File stamped copy with case number sent to Hale)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hale v. Smiley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex L Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Smiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burkett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rekitzke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Cornett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cornett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rippe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Due
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vazques
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: WESTVILLE E-FILE(Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?