Taylor v. J P Morgan Chase, Cahse Home Finance
Plaintiff: Anthony G Taylor
Defendant: J P Morgan Chase, Cahse Home Finance
Case Number: 4:2016cv00052
Filed: July 5, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Office: Lafayette Office
County: Tippecanoe
Presiding Judge: John E Martin
Presiding Judge: James T Moody
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 OPINION AND ORDER: The Plaintiff's 68 Objection to Magistrate's Findings, Report and Recommendation, is OVERRULED and the 67 Report and Recommendation is ADOPTED. Accordingly, Defendant's 37 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings , filed by Defendant, JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA, on 1/4/2017, is GRANTED, and the Clerk is ORDERED to DISMISS all claims against Defendant, Chase, WITH PREJUDICE. Plaintiff's 46 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, filed by pro se Plaintiff, Anthony G. Taylor, on 1/27/2017 is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Rudy Lozano on 8/30/2017. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(jss)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 OPINOIN AND ORDER granting 23 Motion to Amend/Correct Answer. The Court ORDERS Defendant to file its First Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses, currently on the docket as an attachment to the instant Motion on or before 12/28/16. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 12/20/16. (cc: Plaintiff). (nal)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 OPINION AND ORDER: Court DENIES 13 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses, WITH LEAVE TO RE-FILE a renewed motion by 11/21/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 11/7/2016. cc: Taylor (tc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. J P Morgan Chase, Cahse Home Finance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony G Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J P Morgan Chase, Cahse Home Finance
Represented By: Louis S Chronowski
Represented By: Jordan S Huttenlocker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?