Transflo Terminal Services Inc v. Certified DEF LLC
Plaintiff: Transflo Terminal Services Inc
Defendant: CERTIFIED DEF, LLC and Certified DEF LLC
Case Number: 4:2018cv00051
Filed: July 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Office: Lafayette Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: James T Moody
Referring Judge: Andrew P Rodovich
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 49:10101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2018 Filing 12 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties (Standard Track). Magistrate Consent forms due by 10/4/2018. (tc)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARING: In Person Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 10/12/2018 09:30 AM (HMD Time), US District Court in the Hammond Division before Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich. A proposed Discovery Plan under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) to be filed no later than five (5) business days prior to the pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 9/13/2018. (tc)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 9/13/2018. (tc)
September 12, 2018 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Certified DEF LLC. (Costakis, Thomas)
September 12, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Transflo Terminal Services Inc by Certified DEF LLC.(Costakis, Thomas)
September 12, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Blake P Holler on behalf of Certified DEF LLC (Holler, Blake)
September 12, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J Costakis on behalf of Certified DEF LLC (Costakis, Thomas)
August 10, 2018 Set Deadlines: Certified DEF LLC Answer due 8/22/2018 (jld)
August 9, 2018 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 served on Certified DEF, LLC on 8/1/2018, filed by Transflo Terminal Services Inc. (Frey, Timothy)
August 8, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy L Frey on behalf of Transflo Terminal Services Inc (Frey, Timothy)
July 20, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Transflo Terminal Services Inc. (Cohen, Jeffrey)
July 20, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Certified DEF LLC. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (sct)
July 20, 2018 Senior Judge James T Moody and Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich added. (New Case) (sct)
July 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Certified DEF, LLC( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3626488.), filed by Transflo Terminal Services Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Cohen, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Transflo Terminal Services Inc v. Certified DEF LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CERTIFIED DEF, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certified DEF LLC
Represented By: Blake P Holler
Represented By: Thomas J Costakis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Transflo Terminal Services Inc
Represented By: Jeffrey D Cohen
Represented By: Timothy L Frey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?