Doe v. Duerfahrd et al
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Defendant: Lance Duerfahrd, Purdue University Board of Trustees and Purdue University
Case Number: 4:2018cv00072
Filed: September 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Joseph S Van Bokkelen
Referring Judge: John E Martin
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Per DE #8 , Purdue University answer due 11/21/2018 (nae)
October 16, 2018 Filing 8 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Purdue University ; answer due by November 21, 2018. (Kealey, William)
October 9, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by William P Kealey on behalf of Purdue University (Kealey, William)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney John P Kristensen PHV for Jane Doe. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 9/24/18. (ksc)
September 21, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Lance Duerfahrd, Purdue University. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (sct)
September 21, 2018 Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. (New Case)
September 20, 2018 Filing 4 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Jane Doe, filed by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Blessing, Thomas)
September 20, 2018 Filing 3 Application for Attorney John P Kristensen to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jane Doe. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-3685216(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, )
September 20, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas W Blessing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Blessing, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Duerfahrd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lance Duerfahrd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue University Board of Trustees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue University
Represented By: William P Kealey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Thomas W Blessing
Represented By: John P Kristensen PHV
Represented By: Marietto V Massillamany
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?