Marinov v. Fiat Chrysler Automotive
Plaintiff: Vassil Markov Marinov
Defendant: Fiat Chrysler Automotive
Case Number: 4:2018cv00075
Filed: October 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Joseph S Van Bokkelen
Referring Judge: James T Moody
2 Judge: Andrew P Rodovich
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2018 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Fiat Chrysler Automotive. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (cc: Plaintiff)(ksp)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying #8 Motion to not have mail sent. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 12/5/18. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(ksp)
December 3, 2018 ***Deadlines/Hearings terminated. Filing Fee paid. (ksp)
December 3, 2018 Filing 9 Filing fee received: $ 400, receipt number INN4000427. (ksp)
November 9, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to not have mail sent to Plaintiff from 11/19/18 to 1/18/19 by Plaintiff Vassil Markov Marinov. (mlc)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DENYING Vassil Markov Marinov leave to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF #2 ). GRANTS Vassil Markov Marinov until December 7, 2018, to pay the $400 filing fee. CAUTIONS Vassil Markov Marinov if he does not respond by the deadline, this case will be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen on 11/07/2018. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(sct)
October 26, 2018 Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen added. Senior Judge James T Moody no longer assigned to case. (ksp)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #5 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Vassil Markov Marinov.The Court VACATES the order dismissing this case inadvertently opened (DE 4); DIRECTS the clerk to note the motion to proceed in forma pauperis (DE 2) is still pending, and DIRECTS the clerk to reassign this case to Judge Van Bokkelen pursuant to N.D. Ind. L.R. 40-1. Signed by Senior Judge James T Moody on 10/25/18. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(ksp)
October 22, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Reconsideration of Court's Order by Plaintiff Vassil Markov Marinov. (ksp)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 *** VACATED PER DE #6 *** ORDER DISMISSING CASE as INADVERTENTLY OPENED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to docket the Complaint (DE 1) in Marinov v. Fiat Chrysler Automotive, 4:18-cv-56 as an Amended Complaint. Signed by Senior Judge James T Moody on 10/11/18. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(ksp) Modified on 10/26/2018 to add text (ksp).
October 10, 2018 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury (filed as a Motion) by Vassil Markov Marinov. (mlc)
October 9, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by 1 copies of summons forms and 1 copies of USM-285 forms by Plaintiff Vassil Markov Marinov. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 USM 285)(mlc)
October 9, 2018 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT with 1 copies of summons forms and 1 copies of USM-285 forms against Fiat Chrysler Automotive, filed by Vassil Markov Marinov.(mlc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marinov v. Fiat Chrysler Automotive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fiat Chrysler Automotive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vassil Markov Marinov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?