Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division/IBT v. Norfolk Southern Corp.
Plaintiff: BROTHERHOOD OF MAINTENANCE OF WAY EMPLOYES DIVISION/IBT
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Corp.
Case Number: 4:2018cv00086
Filed: November 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Joseph S Van Bokkelen
Referring Judge: John E Martin
Nature of Suit: Labor: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 45:151
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2019 Filing 23 Witness List/Exhibit List for 1/4/2019 hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (jss)
January 4, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION HEARING held on 1/4/2019 re #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and to dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Norfolk Southern Corp before Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen. Pla appeared by atty Richard Edelman. Dft appeared by attys John Duffey, Robert Hawkins, Andrew Rolfes. Arguments heard, 3 witnesses sworn as to statements. Deft moves to admit exhibits 1-16; admitted w/o objection. Pltf moves to admit exhibit 1; admitted w/o objection. The Court will take the matter under advisement and issue a written order. (Court Reporter Ashley Stokes.) (jss)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Richard S Edelman PHV for Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division/IBT. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 1/3/2019. (mtr)
December 28, 2018 Filing 20 Application for Attorney Richard S. Edelman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division/IBT f. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-3770038(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, )
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Andrew J Rolfes PHV for Norfolk Southern Corp. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 12/28/2018. (mtr)
December 27, 2018 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and to dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Norfolk Southern Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit C)(Duffey, John)
December 21, 2018 Filing 17 Application for Attorney Andrew J. Rolfes to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Norfolk Southern Corp.. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-3767205(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, )
December 17, 2018 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and to dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division/IBT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Jack E. David with Exhibits, #2 Exhibit B - Order Granting Unopposed Motion of the Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes to Vacate Order of Preliminary Injunction)(Vlink, David)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #8 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Robert S Hawkins PHV for Norfolk Southern Corp. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 12/11/2018. (mtr)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 12/11/2018. (smb)
December 7, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Hearing/Deadlines: regarding #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and to dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint : With agreement of the parties, Plaintiff's Response is to be filed by 12/17/2018; and Defendant's Reply to be filed by 12/27/2018. The Motion Hearing is set for 1/4/2019 at 11:00 AM (Central Time) in US District Court - Hammond before Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen.(jss)
December 7, 2018 Filing 12 BRIEF in Support of #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and to dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Norfolk Southern Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kerby, #2 Exhibits to Kerby Declaration, #3 Declaration of Wilson)(Duffey, John)
December 7, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and to dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Norfolk Southern Corp.. (Duffey, John)
December 5, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to #7 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division/IBT.(Vlink, David)
December 4, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew M Humble on behalf of Norfolk Southern Corp. (Humble, Matthew)
December 3, 2018 Filing 8 Application for Attorney Robert S Hawkins to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Norfolk Southern Corp.. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-3748123(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/11/2018: #1 PA & NJ Certificates) (mtr).
November 28, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division/IBT by Norfolk Southern Corp..(Duffey, John)
November 27, 2018 Filing 6 REFILED (with atty signature) see DE #7 Norfolk Southern's ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division/IBT by Norfolk Southern Corp.(Duffey, John) Modified on 11/28/2018 to note no atty signature (kjp). Modified on 11/30/2018 (kjp).
November 27, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Norfolk Southern Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Norfolk Southern Railway Company for Norfolk Southern Corp... (Duffey, John)
November 27, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by John C Duffey on behalf of Norfolk Southern Corp. (Duffey, John)
November 8, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Norfolk Southern Corp. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (ksc)
November 8, 2018 Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added (NEW CASE). (ksc)
November 7, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by David T Vlink on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Vlink, David)
November 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Norfolk Southern Corp.( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3727858.), filed by BROTHERHOOD OF MAINTENANCE OF WAY EMPLOYES DIVISION/IBT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Vlink, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division/IBT v. Norfolk Southern Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Corp.
Represented By: Robert S Hawkins PHV
Represented By: Matthew M Humble
Represented By: John C Duffey
Represented By: Andrew J Rolfes PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BROTHERHOOD OF MAINTENANCE OF WAY EMPLOYES DIVISION/IBT
Represented By: David T Vlink
Represented By: Richard S Edelman PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?