Design Basics LLC v. Clayton Homes of Lafayette Inc
Plaintiff: Design Basics, LLC and Design Basics LLC
Defendant: Clayton Homes of Lafayette, Inc. and Clayton Homes of Lafayette Inc
Case Number: 4:2018cv00095
Filed: November 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Susan L Collins
Referring Judge: Theresa L Springmann
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Design Basics LLC. Clayton Homes of Lafayette Inc served on 12/20/2018, answer due 1/10/2019. (Quinn, Sean)
December 17, 2018 Filing 7 ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED as to Clayton Homes of Lafayette Inc. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (rmc)
December 14, 2018 Filing 6 Proposed Summons filed by Design Basics LLC. (Quinn, Sean)
December 3, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Clayton Homes of Lafayette Inc. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (lhc)
December 3, 2018 Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. *NEW CASE* (lhc)
November 30, 2018 Filing 4 REPORT by Design Basics, LLC REPORT ON THE FILING OR DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION OR APPEAL REGARDING A COPYRIGHT. (Quinn, Sean)
November 30, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Design Basics, LLC. (Quinn, Sean)
November 30, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean J Quinn on behalf of Design Basics, LLC (Quinn, Sean)
November 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3747549.), filed by Design Basics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 1380 Paterson, #2 Exhibit 2 - 1752 Lancaster, #3 Exhibit 3 - 3090 Jarrett, #4 Exhibit 4 - 2618 Paisley, #5 Exhibit 5 - 3246 Jennings, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Proposed Summons)(Quinn, Sean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Design Basics LLC v. Clayton Homes of Lafayette Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clayton Homes of Lafayette, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clayton Homes of Lafayette Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Design Basics, LLC
Represented By: Sean J Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Design Basics LLC
Represented By: Sean J Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?