Design Basics, LLC v. Tempest Homes LLC
Plaintiff: Design Basics, LLC
Defendant: Tempest Homes LLC
Case Number: 4:2018cv00097
Filed: December 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Susan L Collins
Referring Judge: Theresa L Springmann
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2019 Filing 12 TELEPHONIC RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 2/7/2019 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Pla appeared by atty Sean Quinn. Dft appeared by atty Dane Mize. The #10 Report of the Parties Planning Meeting is approved in all respects (except dispositive motions deadline and establishment of a trial date) and is hereby made an ORDER of the Court. The Summary Judgment deadline in Fed.R.Civ.P. 56(b) SHALL NOT control. Any dispositive motion SHALL brief out in accordance with L.R. 56-1. DISCOVERY DEADLINE is 1/20/2020. Following the close of discovery, unless otherwise ordered by the Court, the assigned District Judge will establish all further deadlines and dates. Parties are to file a Notice with the Court by 3/29/2019 advising of their selection of a mediator. Magistrate Consent forms due by 2/28/2019. (FTR 1st floor.) (mr)
February 4, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Tempest Homes LLC.(Mize, Dane)
February 1, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Quinn, Sean)
January 7, 2019 Filing 9 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties (Standard Track). (mr)
January 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 2/7/2019 at 9:45 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Court to initiate call.(mr)
January 4, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Tempest Homes LLC answer due by 2/4/19 per #7 Agreed Notice filed. (kjp)
January 4, 2019 Filing 7 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Tempest Homes LLC ; answer due by 2-4-2019. (Mize, Dane)
January 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Dane A Mize on behalf of Tempest Homes LLC (Mize, Dane)
December 21, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Design Basics, LLC. Tempest Homes LLC served on 12/17/2018, answer due 1/7/2019. (Quinn, Sean)
December 13, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Tempest Homes LLC. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (lns)
December 13, 2018 Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (NEW CASE) (lns)
December 12, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Design Basics, LLC. (Quinn, Sean)
December 12, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean J Quinn on behalf of Design Basics, LLC (Quinn, Sean)
December 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3757872.), filed by Design Basics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Plan 8037 Carriage Hills, #2 Supplement Form AO121, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons)(Quinn, Sean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Design Basics, LLC v. Tempest Homes LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tempest Homes LLC
Represented By: Dane A Mize
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Design Basics, LLC
Represented By: Sean J Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?