Crawford v. Life Insurance Company of North America

Plaintiff: William Crawford
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 4:2019cv00016
Filed: February 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Joshua P Kolar
Referring Judge: James T Moody
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2019 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (O'Ryan, Bridget)
April 15, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America.(Kalas, Jennifer)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Court GRANTS #10 Joint Motion for Leave to Participate in Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference Telephonically. The Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 4/25/2019 at 10:00 AM (Central Time) will be held telephonically. Court to initiate the call. If a different number than what is listed on the docket should be used to reach counsel directly, please contact Magistrate Judge Kolar's Case Manager Teresa Castillo at (219) 852-6707 no later than 24 hours prior to the conference. Approved by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 4/11/2019. Text entry order. (tc)
April 10, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION Joint Motion to Appear Telephonically re #8 Order,, Set Hearings, by Plaintiff William Crawford. (O'Ryan, Bridget)
April 5, 2019 Filing 9 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. Magistrate Consent forms due by 4/26/2019. (tc)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARING: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 4/25/2019 10:00 AM (Central Time) in US District Court, Hammond Division before Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar. A proposed Discovery Plan under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) to be filed no later than five (5) business days prior to the pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 4/5/2019. (tc)
March 4, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due deadline set for 4/15/19, per DE #5 . (kjp)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 3/4/2019. (tc)
March 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel K Ryan on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America (Ryan, Daniel)
March 1, 2019 Filing 5 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Life Insurance Company of North America ; answer due by April 15 2019. (Kalas, Jennifer)
March 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer J Kalas on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America (Kalas, Jennifer)
February 21, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (sct)
February 21, 2019 Senior Judge James T Moody and Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar added. (New Case) (sct)
February 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Bridget L O'Ryan on behalf of William Crawford (O'Ryan, Bridget)
February 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3814380.), filed by William Crawford. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(O'Ryan, Bridget)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crawford v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Daniel K Ryan
Represented By: Jennifer J Kalas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Crawford
Represented By: Bridget L O'Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?