United of Omaha Life Insurance Company v. Borgia, III et al
Plaintiff: United of Omaha Life Insurance Company
Defendant: James A. Diehl and Penny K. Diehl, as Co-Guardians of the persons and of the estates of Minors J.C.B. and T.J.B., Centier Bank as Trustee of the J & T Irrevocable Trust, Joseph C. Borgia, III., Centier Bank, James A Diehl, Jr and Penny K Diehl
Case Number: 4:2019cv00040
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Joshua P Kolar
Referring Judge: James T Moody
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION Stipulated Order for Disbursement and Final Decree of Interpleader by Plaintiff United of Omaha Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 (stipulated order with original signatures))(Kersting, Edna)
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United of Omaha Life Insurance Company. Joseph C. Borgia, III. waiver sent on 4/23/2019, answer due 6/24/2019. (Kersting, Edna)
May 9, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United of Omaha Life Insurance Company. Centier Bank waiver sent on 4/23/2019, answer due 6/24/2019. (Kersting, Edna)
May 7, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United of Omaha Life Insurance Company. James A Diehl, Jr waiver sent on 4/23/2019, answer due 6/24/2019; Penny K Diehl waiver sent on 4/23/2019, answer due 6/24/2019. (Kersting, Edna)
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 There were no Proposed Summons or Request for Waiver of Service received. (sct) Modified on 4/15/2019 (sct).
April 15, 2019 Senior Judge James T Moody and Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar added. (New Case) (sct)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief and in Interpleader against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3862515.), filed by United of Omaha Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Insurance Policy), #2 Exhibit B (Death Certificate), #3 Exhibit C (August 19, 2018 email correspondence with attachments), #4 Exhibit D (October 19, 2018 correspondence), #5 Exhibit E (February 4, 2019 letter with attachments), #6 Exhibit F (beneficiary claim statement), #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kersting, Edna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United of Omaha Life Insurance Company v. Borgia, III et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James A. Diehl and Penny K. Diehl, as Co-Guardians of the persons and of the estates of Minors J.C.B. and T.J.B.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centier Bank as Trustee of the J & T Irrevocable Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph C. Borgia, III.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centier Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James A Diehl, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penny K Diehl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United of Omaha Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Edna S Kersting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?