Hamilton v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Plaintiff: Dennis Hamilton
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 4:2019cv00052
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: John E Martin
Referring Judge: Theresa L Springmann
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 CASE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure re #7 Stipulation to Dismiss. (rs)
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION to Dismiss by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. (Kalas, Jennifer)
June 10, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Pursuant to DE #5 Life Insurance Company of North America answer due 7/22/2019 (nae)
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel K Ryan on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America (Ryan, Daniel)
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Life Insurance Company of North America ; answer due by July 22, 2019. (Kalas, Jennifer)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer J Kalas on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America (Kalas, Jennifer)
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (lns)
May 23, 2019 Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. (NEW CASE) (lns)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Bridget L O'Ryan on behalf of Dennis Hamilton (O'Ryan, Bridget)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Life Insurance Company of North America( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3900795.), filed by Dennis Hamilton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(O'Ryan, Bridget)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hamilton v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Daniel K Ryan
Represented By: Jennifer J Kalas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Hamilton
Represented By: Bridget L O'Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?