Ravenscraft v. Ball Metal Beverage Container Corp et al
Plaintiff: MALCOM RAVENSCRAFT
Defendant: Ball Metal Beverage Container Corp and Ball Corporation
Case Number: 4:2019cv00058
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Joshua P Kolar
Referring Judge: Theresa L Springmann
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Ball Corporation, Ball Metal Beverage Container Corp.(Loeffler, Rebecca)
July 26, 2019 Filing 11 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. Magistrate Consent forms due by 8/22/2019. (tc)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 8/22/2019 11:30 AM in US District Court - Hammond before Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar. A proposed Discovery Plan under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) to be filed no later than five (5) business days prior to the pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 7/26/2019. (tc)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 7/9/2019. (tc)
July 8, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Per #8 , Defendants answers due 8/5/19 (kjp)
July 8, 2019 Filing 8 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Ball Corporation, Ball Metal Beverage Container Corp ; answer due by August 5, 2019. (McLaughlin, Alan)
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Alan L McLaughlin on behalf of Ball Corporation, Ball Metal Beverage Container Corp (McLaughlin, Alan)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca L Loeffler on behalf of Ball Corporation, Ball Metal Beverage Container Corp (Loeffler, Rebecca)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Malcom Ravenscraft. All Defendants served on 6/17/19, answer due 7/8/19. (Falks, Heather)
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Ball Corporation, Ball Metal Beverage Container Corp. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (ksp)
June 10, 2019 Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann and Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar added. (NEW CASE) (ksp)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Darron S Stewart on behalf of MALCOM RAVENSCRAFT (Stewart, Darron)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather R Falks on behalf of MALCOM RAVENSCRAFT (Falks, Heather)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Ball Corporation, Ball Metal Beverage Container Corp( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3916493.), filed by MALCOM RAVENSCRAFT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Falks, Heather)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ravenscraft v. Ball Metal Beverage Container Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MALCOM RAVENSCRAFT
Represented By: Heather R Falks
Represented By: Darron S Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ball Metal Beverage Container Corp
Represented By: Rebecca L Loeffler
Represented By: Alan L McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ball Corporation
Represented By: Rebecca L Loeffler
Represented By: Alan L McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?