Penn v. Shreeji Enterprise, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jann Penn
Defendant: Minesh Patel and Shreeji Enterprise, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00079
Filed: August 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: John E Martin
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Filing 11 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (smb)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER & NOTICE OF HEARING: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 11/14/2019 01:00 PM Central in US District Court - Hammond before Magistrate Judge John E Martin. Proposed joint discovery plan in accordance with FRCP 26(f) due by 11/8/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 10/3/2019. (smb)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 9/23/2019. (smb)
September 18, 2019 Answer due date 10-21-2019, service deadline satisfied 9-18-2019 (lpw)
September 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin J Riley on behalf of All Defendants (Riley, Kevin)
September 16, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER by Shreeji Enterprise, Inc. Waiver of Service of Summons. (Riley, Kevin)
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER by Minesh Patel Waiver of Service of Summons. (Riley, Kevin)
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons sent to Minesh Patel and Shreeji Enterprise, Inc. (Copy mailed to defendants). Waiver of Service due by 9/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order, #2 Complaint) (nal)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Court DEFERS payment of the filing fee, ORDERS the plaintiff to pay the $350.00 filing fee from the proceeds of any recovery received in this case and DIRECTS, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(d), the clerk and the United States Marshals Service to issue and serve process to Minesh Patel, 3551 Webster St., West Lafayette, IN 47906 and and Shreeji Enterprise, Inc., c/o Minesh Patel as Registered Agent, 3551 Webster St., West Lafayette, IN 47906. Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 8/20/19. (nal)
August 19, 2019 Judge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added (NEW CASE) (MOTION PENDING). (shk)
August 17, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by 2 copies of summons forms and by Plaintiff JANN PENN. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons)(Weldy, Ronald)
August 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald E Weldy on behalf of JANN PENN (Weldy, Ronald)
August 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages against All Defendants, filed by JANN PENN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Weldy, Ronald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Penn v. Shreeji Enterprise, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minesh Patel
Represented By: Kevin J Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shreeji Enterprise, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin J Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jann Penn
Represented By: Ronald E Weldy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?