Lintner v. JP Morgan Chase Bank NA
Plaintiff: Marjorie F Lintner
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank NA
Case Number: 4:2019cv00092
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: John E Martin
Referring Judge: Theresa L Springmann
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #10 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (UNOPPOSED) and #11 MOTION to Continue Preliminary Pretrial Conference (UNOPPOSED) filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank NA. JP Morgan Chase Bank NA answer due 12/11/2019. The Court VACATES the preliminary pretrial conference set for 12/09/2019, to be reset after Defendant files its answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 11/14/2019. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (jat)
November 8, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Continue Preliminary Pretrial Conference (UNOPPOSED) by Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(White, Jordan)
November 8, 2019 Filing 10 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (UNOPPOSED) by Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(White, Jordan)
October 15, 2019 Filing 9 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (smb)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER & NOTICE OF HEARING: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 12/9/2019 10:00 AM Central in US District Court - Hammond before Magistrate Judge John E Martin. Proposed joint discovery plan in accordance with FRCP 26(f) due by 12/2/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 10/15/2019. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(smb)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 10/15/2019. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(smb)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Court ORDERS that Defendant Chase has an extension until 11/11/19 within which to respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 10/3/19. (Copy mailed to pro se party). (nal)
October 2, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JP Morgan Chase Bank NA identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. for JP Morgan Chase Bank NA.. (White, Jordan)
October 2, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Pro Se Complaint, by Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(White, Jordan)
October 2, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan M White on behalf of JP Morgan Chase Bank NA (White, Jordan)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to JP Morgan Chase Bank NA. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (ksp)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT with 1 copies of summons forms and 0 copies of USM-285 forms and with Jury Demand against JP Morgan Chase Bank NA (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt #400446), filed by Marjorie F Lintner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ksp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lintner v. JP Morgan Chase Bank NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marjorie F Lintner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank NA
Represented By: Jordan M White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?