TAFS, Inc. v. Nanshan America Advanced Aluminum Technologies LLC et al
Plaintiff: TAFS, Inc.
Defendant: Wes Chaudion, TES Logistics, LLC and Nanshan America Advanced Aluminum Technologies LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00094
Filed: October 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: John E Martin
Referring Judge: James T Moody
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 11/27/2019. (smb)
November 25, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , CROSSCLAIM against TES Logistics, LLC, COUNTERCLAIM against TAFS, Inc. by Nanshan America Advanced Aluminum Technologies LLC.(Brown, Alan)
November 21, 2019 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Cover Sheet, Appearance, Corporate Disclosure Statement served on Wes Chaudion on 11/14/2019, filed by TAFS, Inc.. (Carlisle, Alexander)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Rachel Baker PHV for TAFS, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 11/15/2019. (ace)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Benjamin A Reed PHV for TAFS, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 11/15/2019. (ace)
November 13, 2019 Filing 16 Application for Attorney Rachel H. Baker to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of TAFS, Inc.. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4063178(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, ) (Main Document 16 replaced on 11/14/2019 to correct deficiencies) (ace). Modified on 11/14/2019 (ace).
November 13, 2019 Filing 15 Application for Attorney Benjamin A. Reed to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of TAFS, Inc.. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4063167(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, ) (Main Document 15 replaced on 11/14/2019 to include corrected email) (ace). Modified on 11/14/2019 (ace).
October 30, 2019 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint filed by TAFS, Inc. TES Logistics, LLC served on on 10/22/19, answer due 11/12/19. (Carlisle, Alexander)
October 30, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Nanshan America Advance on 10/7/2019, filed by TAFS, Inc.. (Carlisle, Alexander)
October 28, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Nanshan America Advance Aluminum Technologies, LLC answer due 11/25/19 per #11 Agreed Notice (kjp)
October 25, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip KJ Lashutka on behalf of Nanshan America Advanced Aluminum Technologies LLC (Lashutka, Philip)
October 25, 2019 Filing 11 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Nanshan America Advanced Aluminum Technologies LLC ; answer due by November 25, 2019. (Brown, Alan)
October 25, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nanshan America Advanced Aluminum Technologies LLC. (Brown, Alan)
October 25, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Alan S Brown on behalf of Nanshan America Advanced Aluminum Technologies LLC (Brown, Alan)
October 21, 2019 Filing 8 STATEMENT of Jurisdiction, Supplemented filed by TAFS, Inc.. (Zoccola, James)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to FILE, on or before 10/21/2019, a supplemental jurisdictional statement regarding the citizenship of the parties as outlined in this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 10/7/19. (ksp)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL: Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar recused. Case randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge John E Martin for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 10/03/2019. (jat)
October 3, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Wes Chaudion, Nanshan America Advanced Aluminum Technologies LLC, TES Logistics, LLC. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (kjp)
October 3, 2019 Senior Judge James T Moody and Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar added. NEW CASE (kjp)
October 2, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TAFS, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Jacobson Holdings, Inc. for TAFS, Inc... (Carlisle, Alexander)
October 2, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander R Carlisle on behalf of TAFS, Inc. (Carlisle, Alexander)
October 2, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by James E Zoccola on behalf of TAFS, Inc. (Zoccola, James)
October 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4024490.), filed by TAFS, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons)(Zoccola, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TAFS, Inc. v. Nanshan America Advanced Aluminum Technologies LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wes Chaudion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TES Logistics, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nanshan America Advanced Aluminum Technologies LLC
Represented By: Alan S Brown
Represented By: Philip KJ Lashutka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAFS, Inc.
Represented By: James E Zoccola
Represented By: Alexander R Carlisle
Represented By: Benjamin A Reed PHV
Represented By: Rachel Baker PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?