EZ Tankless, Inc v. Noritz America Corporation
Plaintiff: EZ Tankless, Inc
Defendant: Noritz America Corporation
Case Number: 4:2020cv00062
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: John E Martin
Referring Judge: Theresa L Springmann
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Filing 17 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (smb)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER & NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephoic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 10/1/2020 10:00 AM Central before Magistrate Judge John E Martin. Proposed joint discovery plan in accordance with FRCP 26(f) due by 9/25/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 9/11/2020. (smb)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 9/11/2020. (smb)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jeremy L Buxbaum PHV for Noritz America Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 9/10/2020. (ace)
September 10, 2020 Filing 13 Application for Attorney Thomas Lee Holt, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Noritz America Corporation. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4337022(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, )
September 8, 2020 Filing 12 Application for Attorney Jeremy Lewis Buxbaum to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Noritz America Corporation. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4335030(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, ) (Main Document 12 replaced on 9/9/2020) (ace).
August 28, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against EZ Tankless, Inc by Noritz America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Registration Certificate (4800941), #2 Exhibit B - Registration Certificate (5731024), #3 Exhibit C - EZ Tankless Application (87682289))(Hayes, Margaret)
August 28, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Noritz America Corporation. (Hayes, Margaret)
August 28, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret E Hayes on behalf of Noritz America Corporation (Hayes, Margaret)
August 12, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by EZ Tankless, Inc. Noritz America Corporation served on 8/7/2020, answer due 8/28/2020. (Osorio, Amanda)
July 23, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by EZ Tankless, Inc Civil Cover Sheet (Osorio, Amanda)
July 23, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by EZ Tankless, Inc Form AO120 (Osorio, Amanda)
July 23, 2020 Remark: Sent email to Attorney Amanda Osorio to file AO 120 form and civil cover sheet. (rmc)
July 23, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Noritz America Corporation. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (rmc)
July 23, 2020 Judge Theresa L Springmann and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. (NEW CASE) (rmc)
July 22, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by EZ Tankless, Inc. (Osorio, Amanda)
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons filed by EZ Tankless, Inc. (Osorio, Amanda)
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Noritz America Corporation( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4289809.), filed by EZ Tankless, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Osorio, Amanda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EZ Tankless, Inc v. Noritz America Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noritz America Corporation
Represented By: Jeremy L Buxbaum PHV
Represented By: Margaret E Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EZ Tankless, Inc
Represented By: Amanda M Osorio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?