Miller et al v. Miller et al
Plaintiff: Louie E Coble and Jennifer L Miller
Defendant: Monticello Police Department and Nathaneal C Miller
Case Number: 4:2020cv00063
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Joseph S Van Bokkelen
Referring Judge: Andrew P Rodovich
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 2721
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER: The parties have filed a #15 Notice of Resolution and Motion to Vacate. Accordingly, the Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 9/18/2020 and all pending deadlines are VACATED. Parties DIRECTED to file dismissal papers by 10/19/2020. By Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 9/4/2020. Text entry only. (tc)
September 3, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE by Nathaneal C Miller, Monticello Police Department /Notice of Resolution and Motion to Vacate (Kleber, Rebecca)
September 2, 2020 Filing 14 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (tc)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 9/18/2020 11:00 AM in US District Court - Hammond before Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich. Court to initiate the call. If a different number than is listed on the docket should be used to reach counsel directly, please contact Judge Rodovich's Case Manager at teresa_castillo@innd.uscourts.gov at least 24 hours prior to the conference. A proposed Discovery Plan under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) to be filed no later than five (5) business days prior to the pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 9/2/2020. (tc)
August 11, 2020 Filing 12 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Summons in a Civil Action Acknowledgement filed by Louie E Coble, Jennifer L Miller. (Ledger, Brooks)
August 11, 2020 Filing 11 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Summons in a Civil Action Acknowledgement filed by Louie E Coble, Jennifer L Miller. (Ledger, Brooks)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 8/10/2020. (tc)
August 4, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Kleber on behalf of Nathaneal C Miller, Monticello Police Department (Kleber, Rebecca)
August 4, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint re #1 Complaint, by Defendants Nathaneal C Miller, Monticello Police Department. (Hike, J) Modified on 8/4/2020 to reflect document is not a motion (tc).
August 4, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by J Blake Hike on behalf of Nathaneal C Miller, Monticello Police Department (Hike, J)
July 23, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Nathaneal C Miller, Monticello Police Department. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (mlc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/28/2020: #1 Main Document) (mlc).
July 23, 2020 Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen and Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich added. (NEW CASE) (mlc)
July 22, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by Louie E Coble, Jennifer L Miller Civil Cover Sheet (Ledger, Brooks)
July 22, 2020 Filing 4 Proposed Summons filed by Louie E Coble, Jennifer L Miller. (Ledger, Brooks)
July 22, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons filed by Louie E Coble, Jennifer L Miller. (Ledger, Brooks)
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Brooks B C Ledger on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Ledger, Brooks)
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4289849.), filed by Jennifer L Miller, Louie E Coble. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Ledger, Brooks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller et al v. Miller et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louie E Coble
Represented By: Brooks B C Ledger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer L Miller
Represented By: Brooks B C Ledger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monticello Police Department
Represented By: J Blake Hike
Represented By: Rebecca Kleber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathaneal C Miller
Represented By: J Blake Hike
Represented By: Rebecca Kleber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?