Miller v Fergusson et al
Plaintiff: Randy J Miller
Defendant: Jennifer Fergusson and Roy
Case Number: 4:2020cv00068
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Rodovich
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The court STRIKES the complaint #1 ; DIRECTS the clerk to place this cause number on a blank Pro Se 14 (INND Rev. 2/20) Prisoner Complaint form and a blank Prisoner Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis AO 240 (Rev. 7/10) (INND Rev. 8/16) and send them to the plaintiff; GRANTS the plaintiff until 9/24/2020, to either pay the filing fee or file an in forma pauperis motion on the court's form, accompanied by his trust fund ledgers for the past six months, and file an amended complaint as outlined herein; and CAUTIONS him that if he does not respond by the deadline, this case is subject to dismissal without further notice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 8/20/2020. (Copy mailed to pro se party with forms)(bas)
August 17, 2020 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Indiana Southern; Case Number 1:20-cv-02107. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 13, 2020 Filing 5 Transfer Letter to Clerk of the Northern District of Indiana. Case transferred electronically to Northern District of Indiana - Hammond Division, on August 13, 2020. (DWH) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 8/17/2020.]
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CLOSED TRANSFER - Order Transferring Action to Northern District of Indiana: Plaintiff Randy J. Miller is currently incarcerated at the Miami Correctional Facility. He brings this action against employees of the Carroll County Jail, alleging that they violated his constitutional rights and his rights under the Americans with Disabilities Act. Dkt. 1. Carroll County is in the Northern District of Indiana. 28 U.S.C. 94(a)(3). Here, the alleged misconduct giving rise to the claims occurred in the Northern District of Indiana and the defendants are located there. Under these circumstances, the appropriate venue for the action is the Northern District of Indiana. See 28 U.S.C. 1391(b); 28 U.S.C. 1404. Accordingly, the above action is now TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Indiana Hammond Division at Lafayette, Indiana. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 8/13/2020. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. (DWH) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 8/17/2020.]
August 12, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. Copy distributed to Plaintiff via US mail. (TMC) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 8/17/2020.]
August 11, 2020 Filing 2 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 8/17/2020.]
August 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JENNIFER FERGUSSON and ROY, filed by RANDY J. MILLER. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(DJH) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 8/17/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v Fergusson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Fergusson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy J Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?