Harris v. Max Freight, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kaia Harris
Defendant: Max Freight, Inc. and Donald G. Hausenfluck
Case Number: 4:2021cv00053
Filed: August 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Rodovich
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Travis N Jensen on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Jensen, Travis)
September 24, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Walter Johnson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Johnson, Robert)
September 24, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Janet Melissa Ann Horne on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Horne, Janet)
September 24, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Walter Johnson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Johnson, Robert) ***FILING ERROR; ATTORNEY INSTRUCTED TO REFILE; ATTORNEY REFILED AT #21 *** Modified on 9/27/2021 (ace). Modified on 9/30/2021 (ace).
September 24, 2021 Filing 17 TELEPHONIC RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 9/24/2021 before Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich. Pla appeared by atty Robert Johnson. Dfts appeared by atty James Roehrdanz. The Report filed as DE #16 is APPROVED and ADOPTED as follows: Initial Disclosures to be exchanged by 11/16/2021. All discovery to be completed by 9/1/2022. Plaintiff expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the defendant by 7/1/2022. Defendant expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the plaintiff by 8/1/2022. The last date any party may seek leave of court to join additional parties and to amend the pleadings is 11/9/2021. Magistrate Consent forms due by 10/15/2021. All other dates/ddls to be set by presiding judge at a later time. (tc)
September 16, 2021 Filing 16 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Roehrdanz, James)
September 7, 2021 Filing 15 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (tc)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 9/24/2021 10:30 AM (Central time) before Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich. Court to initiate the call. If a different number than is listed on the docket should be used to reach counsel directly, please contact Judge Rodovich's Case Manager at teresa_castillo@innd.uscourts.gov at least 24 hours prior to the conference. A proposed Discovery Plan under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) to be filed no later than five (5) business days prior to the pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 9/7/2021. (tc)
August 25, 2021 Filing 13 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint by Donald G. Hausenfluck, Max Freight, Inc..(Kuck, Marie)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: The court STRIKES Defendants Max Freight, Inc. and Donald G. Hausenfluck's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint for Damages and Demand for Jury Trial #11 filed on 8/25/2021. Responsive pleadings must restate verbatim the paragraphs from the pleading they respond to and must, immediately following each restated paragraph, state the response to that paragraph. N.D. Ind. L.R. 10-1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 8/25/2021. (bas)
August 25, 2021 Filing 11 *STRICKEN pursuant to DE #12 Order dated 8/25/2021* Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint by Donald G. Hausenfluck, Max Freight, Inc..(Kuck, Marie) Modified on 8/25/2021 (bas).
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 8/25/2021. (tc)
August 24, 2021 Filing 9 Filing fee payment ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0755-4665836.) by Donald G. Hausenfluck, Max Freight, Inc..(Kuck, Marie) Modified on 8/24/2021 - Docket entry made for fee payment only(ksc).
August 20, 2021 Filing 8 (Duplicate see DE #6 ) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Max Freight, Inc. (Kuck, Marie) Modified on 8/23/2021 to update (mrm).
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER: Defendants directed to pay the filing fee in this matter by 9/3/2021. Approved by Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 8/20/2021. Text entry only. (tc)
August 20, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Max Freight, Inc.. (Kuck, Marie)
August 19, 2021 **New case** **No filing fee or IFP** Judge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich added. (kms)
August 18, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE by Donald G. Hausenfluck, Max Freight, Inc. Notice of Filing Removal Notice in Tippecanoe Co. Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Removal Tippecanoe Co.)(Kuck, Marie)
August 18, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by James W Roehrdanz on behalf of All Defendants (Roehrdanz, James)
August 18, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Marie Alexander Kuck on behalf of All Defendants (Kuck, Marie)
August 18, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Tippecanoe Co. Superior Court, Cause No. 79D01-2106-CT-000100, filed by Donald G. Hausenfluck, Max Freight, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice to Clerk, #3 Pleadings, #4 Complaint)(Kuck, Marie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Max Freight, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaia Harris
Represented By: Robert Walter Johnson
Represented By: Janet Melissa Ann Horne
Represented By: Travis N Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Max Freight, Inc.
Represented By: James W Roehrdanz
Represented By: Marie Alexander Kuck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald G. Hausenfluck
Represented By: James W Roehrdanz
Represented By: Marie Alexander Kuck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?