Summers v. Crossroads Galvanizing, LLC
Defendant: Crossroads Galvanizing, LLC
Estate Plaintiff: Cory J. Summers
Case Number: 4:2021cv00074
Filed: November 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: John E Martin
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE: Crossroads Galvanizing, LLC was directed to return the Consent to or Declination of the Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge attached at Docket Entry #11 regarding consenting or declining to consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. The time for doing so has now passed, and the Clerk's Office has not received the form. Crossroads Galvanizing, LLC shall return the form within 10 days of the date of this entry. If, after the expiration of the 10-day extension set forth herein, the Court chooses to take further action, all applicable deadline extensions will be considered at that time. Counsel also advised of 10-day consent deadline by phone (shk)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Response to be filed by 2/2/2022. Reply to be filed by 2/9/2022.Approved by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 12/22/2021. No pdf attached.(cp)
December 21, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Plaintiff Cory J. Summers. (Keyes, Matthew)
December 14, 2021 Filing 11 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. Magistrate Consent forms due by 1/4/2022. (smb)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 12/14/2021. (smb)
December 13, 2021 Filing 9 BRIEF in Support of #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Crossroads Galvanizing, LLC. (Mervilde, John)
December 13, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Crossroads Galvanizing, LLC. (Mervilde, John)
November 19, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Neil A Davis on behalf of Crossroads Galvanizing, LLC (Davis, Neil)
November 19, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by John W Mervilde on behalf of Crossroads Galvanizing, LLC (Mervilde, John)
November 18, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE by Crossroads Galvanizing, LLC of Compliance with Notice Requirement (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice to State court)(Mervilde, John)
November 18, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by William N Riley on behalf of Cory J. Summers (Riley, William)
November 18, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Sundeep Singh on behalf of Cory J. Summers (Singh, Sundeep)
November 18, 2021 **NEW CASE** Judge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. (jdb)
November 17, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number BINNDC-4754837.) from Tippecanoe Superior Court, Cause No. 79D01-2110-CT-000164, filed by Crossroads Galvanizing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit state court pleadings)(Mervilde, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Summers v. Crossroads Galvanizing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Estate plaintiff: Cory J. Summers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crossroads Galvanizing, LLC
Represented By: John W Mervilde
Represented By: Neil A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?