All In Transportation, LLC v. Pilot Travel Centers, LLC
Plaintiff: ALL IN TRANSPORTATION, LLC
Defendant: PILOT TRAVEL CENTERS, LLC and Pilot Travel Centers LLC
Case Number: 4:2022cv00035
Filed: May 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: John E Martin
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2022 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss , or, in the Alternative, Motion for More Definite Statement (Reply in Support) filed by Pilot Travel Centers LLC. (Alexander, Adam)
June 30, 2022 Filing 15 TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held 6/30/2022 before Magistrate Judge John E Martin. Pla appeared by atty Donald Shelmon. Dft appeared by attys Andrew Miroff, Adam Alexander. The Court STAYS DISCOVERY until after ruling on pending motions as proposed in Joint Report #12 . R16B Prelim Pretrial Conference to be reset after ruling on motions. The parties are given an extension of time to return the Consent to or Declination of the Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge to 7/14/2022. (#FTR.) (smb)
June 27, 2022 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss , or, in the Alternative, Motion for More Definite Statement filed by All In Transportation, LLC. (Shelmon, Donald)
June 27, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald W Shelmon on behalf of All In Transportation, LLC (Shelmon, Donald)
June 23, 2022 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Miroff, Andrew)
June 13, 2022 Filing 11 BRIEF in Support of #10 MOTION to Dismiss , or, in the Alternative, Motion for More Definite Statement filed by Pilot Travel Centers LLC. (Alexander, Adam)
June 13, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss , or, in the Alternative, Motion for More Definite Statement by Defendant Pilot Travel Centers LLC. (Alexander, Adam)
June 2, 2022 Filing 9 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (smb)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER & NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 6/30/2022 10:30 AM Central before Magistrate Judge John E Martin. Proposed joint discovery plan in accordance with FRCP 26(f) due by 6/24/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 6/2/2022. (smb)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 5/11/2022. (smb)
May 11, 2022 Reset Deadlines: Pilot Travel Centers LLC answer due 6/13/2022 pursuant to DE #6 . (kms)
May 10, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE by Pilot Travel Centers LLC (of Automatic Initial Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint) (Alexander, Adam)
May 10, 2022 **NEW CASE** Judge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. (nae)
May 9, 2022 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PILOT TRAVEL CENTERS, LLC. (Alexander, Adam)
May 9, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew J Miroff on behalf of PILOT TRAVEL CENTERS, LLC (Miroff, Andrew)
May 9, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam M Alexander on behalf of PILOT TRAVEL CENTERS, LLC (Alexander, Adam)
May 9, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AINNDC-4912377.) from Jasper Superior Court, Cause No. 37D01-2204-CT-000319, filed by PILOT TRAVEL CENTERS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - State Court Record (Summons, Complaint, Appearance-Plaintiff, Return of Service, Appearance-Defendant), #3 Exhibit 3 - Civil Cover Sheet)(Alexander, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: All In Transportation, LLC v. Pilot Travel Centers, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALL IN TRANSPORTATION, LLC
Represented By: Donald W Shelmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PILOT TRAVEL CENTERS, LLC
Represented By: Andrew J Miroff
Represented By: Adam M Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pilot Travel Centers LLC
Represented By: Andrew J Miroff
Represented By: Adam M Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?