Harris v. Friends of K4, LLC
Plaintiff: Jeff Harris
Defendant: Statutory Agent and Friends of K4, LLC
Case Number: 4:2023cv00037
Filed: May 5, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Joshua P Kolar
Referring Judge: Theresa L Springmann
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 1 U.S. Arbitration Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Petition to Compel Arbitration filed by Jeff Harris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Bernat, Stephen)
June 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER FOR JUDGE THERESA L SPRINGMANN: The Court renders MOOT #5 MOTION to Dismiss per the filing of #6 Amended Complaint. (rs)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. Magistrate Consent forms due by 7/5/2023. (tc)
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Petition to Compel Arbitration by Defendant Friends of K4, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Amended Petition to Compel Arbitration, #2 Exhibit Claimant's Supplemental Post-Hearing Brief, #3 Exhibit Order, #4 Exhibit Plaintiff's Application for Final Judgment Entry Confirming Arbitration Award, #5 Exhibit Complaint with Jury Demand, #6 Exhibit Amended Complaint, #7 Exhibit Answer to Amended Complaint and Counterclaim, #8 Exhibit Plaintiff's Reply to Defendants' Counterclaim, #9 Exhibit Entry, #10 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Amended Petition to Compel Arbitration)(Holden, Kelleene)
June 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 6/2/2023. (tc)
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT by Jeff Harris. . (Bernat, Stephen) Modified on 6/5/2023 to reflect correct document title(rs). Modified on 6/6/2023 (shk).
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION by Defendant Friends of K4, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Entry of Referral to Arbitration, #3 Exhibit B - Arbitrator's Order of 2-29-23, #4 Exhibit C - Complaint, #5 Exhibit D - Amended Complaint, #6 Exhibit E - Answer and Counterclaim, #7 Exhibit F - Reply to Counterclaim, #8 Exhibit G - Excerpt from Harris' Supplemental Post-Hearing Brief, #9 Exhibit H - Motion to Certify Arbitration Award, #10 Supplement Proposed Order)(Holden, Kelleene)
May 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeff Harris. Friends of K4, LLC served on 5/9/2023, answer due 5/30/2023. (Bernat, Stephen)
May 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Friends of K4, LLC. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (rmc)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Proposed Summons filed by Jeff Harris. (Bernat, Stephen)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order **NEW CASE** Judge Theresa L Springmann and Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar added. (shk)
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Statutory Agent( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AINNDC-5235088.), filed by Jeff Harris. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 B, #4 Supplement Appearance of Counsel)(Bernat, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Friends of K4, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Harris
Represented By: Stephen M Bernat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Statutory Agent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Friends of K4, LLC
Represented By: Kelleene A Holden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?