MDG INTERNATIONAL, INC. v. AUSTRALIAN GOLD, INC. Featured Case

Plaintiff MDG International, Inc. alleged that defendant Australian Gold, Inc. breached its Distributorship Agreement by marketing and distributing Australian Gold products to distributors within plaintiff's exclusive territories, and provided plaintiff with expired or soon-to-expire products.

Plaintiff: MDG INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Defendant: AUSTRALIAN GOLD, INC.
Counter Claimant: AUSTRALIAN GOLD, INC.
Counter Defendant: MDG INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Case Number: 1:2007cv01096
Filed: August 28, 2007
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Office: Indianapolis Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge:
Presiding Judge: Tim A. Baker
Presiding Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER granting 152 Motion to Exclude; denying 154 Motion for Relief; denying as moot 166 Motion for Oral Argument (S.O.). Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 6/29/2009. (MAC)
March 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER granting 37 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on South Africa and the United Arab Emirates; denying 39 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Mexico; granting 97 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Cruise Ship Sales; granting in part and denying in part 99 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the Brazil Recall. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 3/17/2009. (CBU)
November 9, 2007 Filing 21
NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Counter Defendant MDG INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Schuerman, Elizabeth)
November 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 19
SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 11/20/2007 01:30 PM in room #234 before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. The parties shall file the CMP no less than three days prior to the ptc (See Order). Signed by Judge Tim A. Baker on 11/2/07. (SWM)
October 23, 2007 Filing 18
NOTICE of Change of Address by Kathleen Ann DeLaney (DeLaney, Kathleen)
October 17, 2007 Filing 17
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re 16 MOTION to Dismiss Constructive Fraud Claim, filed by Defendant AUSTRALIAN GOLD, INC.. (O'Gara, Thomas)
October 11, 2007 Filing 14
NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Ann DeLaney on behalf of Plaintiff MDG INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (DeLaney, Kathleen)
September 11, 2007 Filing 13
NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant AUSTRALIAN GOLD, INC.. (O'Gara, Thomas)
August 29, 2007 Filing 9
RETURN of Personal Service, filed by MDG INTERNATIONAL, INC.. AUSTRALIAN GOLD, INC. served on 8/28/2007. (DeLaney, Edward)
August 28, 2007 Filing 8
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT, filed by Plaintiff MDG INTERNATIONAL, INC. (TAA)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MDG INTERNATIONAL, INC. v. AUSTRALIAN GOLD, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MDG INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Schuerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUSTRALIAN GOLD, INC.
Represented By: Peter Jon Prettyman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: AUSTRALIAN GOLD, INC.
Represented By: Peter Jon Prettyman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: MDG INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Schuerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?