BIG HAT BOOKS et al v. PROSECUTORS: Featured Case

Plaintiffs Big Hat Books, Boxcar Books and Community Center, Inc., American Civil Liberties Union of Indiana Foundation, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, Association of American Publishers, Entertainment Merchants Association, Freedom to Read Foundation, National Association of Recording Merchandisers, Great Lakes Booksellers Association, Indianapolis Museum of Art, Indianapolis Downtown Artists and Dealers Association challenges the constitutionality of House Enrolled Act No. 1042, which requires that persons and entities that intend to offer for sale or to sell literature and other matters deemed harmful to minors under Indiana law register with the Secretary of State and pay a fee.

Plaintiff: BIG HAT BOOKS, BOXCAR BOOKS AND COMMUNITY CENTER, INC., AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF INDIANA FOUNDATION, AMERICAN BOOKSELLERS FOUNDATION FOR FREE EXPRESSION, ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN PUBLISHERS, ENTERTAINMENT MERCHANTS ASSOCIATION, FREEDOM TO READ FOUNDATION, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF RECORDING MERCHANDISERS, GREAT LAKES BOOKSELLERS ASSOCIATION, INDIANAPOLIS MUSEUM OF ART and INDIANAPOLIS DOWNTOWN ARTISTS AND DEALERS ASSOCIATION
Defendant: PROSECUTORS:
Case Number: 1:2008cv00596
Filed: May 7, 2008
Court: Indiana Southern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Marion
Referring Judge: Tim A. Baker
Presiding Judge: Larry J. McKinney
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2008. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 25, 2008 36 NOTICE of settlement of attorney fees, filed by Defendants MIAMI COUNTY PROSECUTOR, MONROE COUNTY PROSECUTOR, MONTGOMERY COUNTY PROSECUTOR, MORGAN COUNTY PROSECUTOR, NEWTON COUNTY PROSECUTOR, NOBLE COUNTY PROSECUTOR, OHIO COUNTY PROSECUTOR, ORANGE COUNTY PROSECUTOR, OWEN COUNTY PROSECUTOR, PARKE COUNTY PROSECUTOR, PERRY COUNTY PROSECUTOR, PIKE COUNTY PROSECUTOR, PORTER COUNTY PROSECUTOR, POSEY COUNTY PROSECUTOR, PULASKI COUNTY PROSECUTOR, PUTNAM COUNTY PROSECUTOR, RANDOLPH COUNTY PROSECUTOR, RIPLEY COUNTY PROSECUTOR, RUSH COUNTY PROSECUTOR, ST. JOSEPH COUNTY PROSECUTOR, SCOTT COUNTY PROSECUTOR, SHELBY COUNTY PROSECUTOR, SPENCER COUNTY PROSECUTOR, STARKE COUNTY PROSECUTOR, STEUBEN COUNTY PROSECUTOR, SULLIVAN COUNTY PROSECUTOR, SWITZERLAND COUNTY PROSECUTOR, TIPPECANOE COUNTY PROSECUTOR, TIPTON COUNTY PROSECUTOR, UNION COUNTY PROSECUTOR, VANDERBURGH COUNTY PROSECUTOR, VERMILLION COUNTY PROSECUTOR, VIGO COUNTY PROSECUTOR, WABASH COUNTY PROSECUTOR, WARREN COUNTY PROSECUTOR, WARRICK COUNTY PROSECUTOR, WASHINGTON COUNTY PROSECUTOR, WAYNE COUNTY PROSECUTOR, WELLS COUNTY PROSECUTOR, WHITE COUNTY PROSECUTOR, WHITLEY COUNTY PROSECUTOR, PROSECUTORS:, ADAMS COUNTY PROSECUTOR, ALLEN COUNTY PROSECUTOR, BARTHOLOMEW COUNTY PROSECUTOR, BENTON COUNTY PROSECUTOR, BLACKFORD COUNTY PROSECUTOR, BOONE COUNTY PROSECUTOR, BROWN COUNTY PROSECUTOR, CARROLL COUNTY PROSECUTOR, CASS COUNTY PROSECUTOR, CLARK COUNTY PROSECUTOR, CLAY COUNTY PROSECUTOR, CLINTON COUNTY PROSECUTOR, CRAWFORD COUNTY PROSECUTOR, DAVIESS COUNTY PROSECUTOR, DEARBORN COUNTY PROSECUTOR, DECATUR COUNTY PROSECUTOR, DEKALB COUNTY PROSECUTOR, DELAWARE COUNTY PROSECUTOR, DUBOIS COUNTY PROSECUTOR, ELKHART COUNTY PROSECUTOR, FAYETTE COUNTY PROSECUTOR, FLOYD COUNTY PROSECUTOR, FOUNTAIN COUNTY PROSECUTOR, FRANKLIN COUNTY PROSECUTOR, FULTON COUNTY PROSECUTOR, GIBSON COUNTY PROSECUTOR, GRANT COUNTY PROSECUTOR, GREENE COUNTY PROSECUTOR, HAMILTON COUNTY PROSECUTOR, HANCOCK COUNTY PROSECUTOR, HARRISON COUNTY PROSECUTOR, HENDRICKS COUNTY PROSECUTOR, HENRY COUNTY PROSECUTOR, HOWARD COUNTY PROSECUTOR, HUNTINGTON COUNTY PROSECUTOR, JACKSON COUNTY PROSECUTOR, JASPER COUNTY PROSECUTOR, JAY COUNTY PROSECUTOR, JEFFERSON COUNTY PROSECUTOR, JENNINGS COUNTY PROSECUTOR, JOHNSON COUNTY PROSECUTOR, KNOX COUNTY PROSECUTOR, KOSCIUSKO COUNTY PROSECUTOR, LAGRANGE COUNTY PROSECUTOR, LAKE COUNTY PROSECUTOR, LA PORTE COUNTY PROSECUTOR, LAWRENCE COUNTY PROSECUTOR, MADISON COUNTY PROSECUTOR, MARION COUNTY PROSECUTOR, MARSHALL COUNTY PROSECUTOR, MARTIN COUNTY PROSECUTOR, Plaintiffs FREEDOM TO READ FOUNDATION, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF RECORDING MERCHANDISERS, GREAT LAKES BOOKSELLERS ASSOCIATION, INDIANAPOLIS MUSEUM OF ART, INDIANAPOLIS DOWNTOWN ARTISTS AND DEALERS ASSOCIATION, BIG HAT BOOKS, BOXCAR BOOKS AND COMMUNITY CENTER, INC., AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF INDIANA FOUNDATION, AMERICAN BOOKSELLERS FOUNDATION FOR FREE EXPRESSION, ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN PUBLISHERS, ENTERTAINMENT MERCHANTS ASSOCIATION (Arthur, David)
October 28, 2008 35 Featured Case ORDER granting plaintiff's 34 Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Attorney Fees to 11/28/08. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 10/28/08. (MAC)
October 24, 2008 34 Fourth MOTION for Extension of Time to November 28, 2008 to Petition for Attorneys' Fees Pursuant to 42 U.S.C. s. 1988, filed by Plaintiffs FREEDOM TO READ FOUNDATION, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF RECORDING MERCHANDISERS, GREAT LAKES BOOKSELLERS ASSOCIATION, INDIANAPOLIS MUSEUM OF ART, INDIANAPOLIS DOWNTOWN ARTISTS AND DEALERS ASSOCIATION, BIG HAT BOOKS, BOXCAR BOOKS AND COMMUNITY CENTER, INC., AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF INDIANA FOUNDATION, AMERICAN BOOKSELLERS FOUNDATION FOR FREE EXPRESSION, ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN PUBLISHERS, ENTERTAINMENT MERCHANTS ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Falk, Kenneth)
September 29, 2008 33 Featured Case ORDER granting plaintiffs 32 Motion for Extension of Time to File their petition for attorneys' fees to 10/29/08. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 08-596. (MAC)
September 24, 2008 32 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to October 29, 2008 to Petition for Attorneys' Fees Pursuant to 42 U.S.C. s. 1988, filed by Plaintiffs FREEDOM TO READ FOUNDATION, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF RECORDING MERCHANDISERS, GREAT LAKES BOOKSELLERS ASSOCIATION, INDIANAPOLIS MUSEUM OF ART, INDIANAPOLIS DOWNTOWN ARTISTS AND DEALERS ASSOCIATION, BIG HAT BOOKS, BOXCAR BOOKS AND COMMUNITY CENTER, INC., AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF INDIANA FOUNDATION, AMERICAN BOOKSELLERS FOUNDATION FOR FREE EXPRESSION, ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN PUBLISHERS, ENTERTAINMENT MERCHANTS ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Falk, Kenneth)
August 27, 2008 31 Featured Case ORDER granting plaintiffs 30 Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Attorney Fees to 9/29/08. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 8/27/08. (MAC)
August 22, 2008 30 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to September 29, 2008 to Petition for Attorneys' Fees Pursuant to 42 U.S.C. s. 1988, filed by Plaintiffs FREEDOM TO READ FOUNDATION, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF RECORDING MERCHANDISERS, GREAT LAKES BOOKSELLERS ASSOCIATION, INDIANAPOLIS MUSEUM OF ART, INDIANAPOLIS DOWNTOWN ARTISTS AND DEALERS ASSOCIATION, BIG HAT BOOKS, BOXCAR BOOKS AND COMMUNITY CENTER, INC., AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF INDIANA FOUNDATION, AMERICAN BOOKSELLERS FOUNDATION FOR FREE EXPRESSION, ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN PUBLISHERS, ENTERTAINMENT MERCHANTS ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Falk, Kenneth)
July 15, 2008 29 Featured Case ORDER granting pltfs' 28 Motion for Extension of Time to File petition for attorneys' fees to 8/29/08. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 7/15/08. (SWM)
July 7, 2008 28 MOTION for Extension of Time to August 29, 2008 to Petition for Attorneys' Fees Pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1988, filed by Plaintiffs FREEDOM TO READ FOUNDATION, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF RECORDING MERCHANDISERS, GREAT LAKES BOOKSELLERS ASSOCIATION, INDIANAPOLIS MUSEUM OF ART, INDIANAPOLIS DOWNTOWN ARTISTS AND DEALERS ASSOCIATION, BIG HAT BOOKS, BOXCAR BOOKS AND COMMUNITY CENTER, INC., AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF INDIANA FOUNDATION, AMERICAN BOOKSELLERS FOUNDATION FOR FREE EXPRESSION, ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN PUBLISHERS, ENTERTAINMENT MERCHANTS ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Falk, Kenneth)
July 1, 2008 27 CLOSED JUDGMENT -Pursuant to the Court's ruling entered on this date final judgment is hereby entered in favor of the pltfs and against defts. Each party shall bear its own costs Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 7/1/08.(CBU)
July 1, 2008 26 Featured Case ORDER granting 21 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 10 Motion for Preliminary Injunction Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 7/1/08. (CBU)
June 12, 2008 25 REPLY in Support of Motion re 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed by Plaintiffs FREEDOM TO READ FOUNDATION, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF RECORDING MERCHANDISERS, GREAT LAKES BOOKSELLERS ASSOCIATION, INDIANAPOLIS MUSEUM OF ART, INDIANAPOLIS DOWNTOWN ARTISTS AND DEALERS ASSOCIATION, BIG HAT BOOKS, BOXCAR BOOKS AND COMMUNITY CENTER, INC., AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF INDIANA FOUNDATION, AMERICAN BOOKSELLERS FOUNDATION FOR FREE EXPRESSION, ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN PUBLISHERS, ENTERTAINMENT MERCHANTS ASSOCIATION. (Albaugh, Matthew)
June 6, 2008 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Defendants MIAMI COUNTY PROSECUTOR, MONROE COUNTY PROSECUTOR, MONTGOMERY COUNTY PROSECUTOR, MORGAN COUNTY PROSECUTOR, NEWTON COUNTY PROSECUTOR, NOBLE COUNTY PROSECUTOR, OHIO COUNTY PROSECUTOR, ORANGE COUNTY PROSECUTOR, OWEN COUNTY PROSECUTOR, PARKE COUNTY PROSECUTOR, PERRY COUNTY PROSECUTOR, PIKE COUNTY PROSECUTOR, PORTER COUNTY PROSECUTOR, POSEY COUNTY PROSECUTOR, PULASKI COUNTY PROSECUTOR, PUTNAM COUNTY PROSECUTOR, RANDOLPH COUNTY PROSECUTOR, RIPLEY COUNTY PROSECUTOR, RUSH COUNTY PROSECUTOR, ST. JOSEPH COUNTY PROSECUTOR, SCOTT COUNTY PROSECUTOR, SHELBY COUNTY PROSECUTOR, SPENCER COUNTY PROSECUTOR, STARKE COUNTY PROSECUTOR, STEUBEN COUNTY PROSECUTOR, SULLIVAN COUNTY PROSECUTOR, SWITZERLAND COUNTY PROSECUTOR, TIPPECANOE COUNTY PROSECUTOR, TIPTON COUNTY PROSECUTOR, UNION COUNTY PROSECUTOR, VANDERBURGH COUNTY PROSECUTOR, VERMILLION COUNTY PROSECUTOR, VIGO COUNTY PROSECUTOR, WABASH COUNTY PROSECUTOR, WARREN COUNTY PROSECUTOR, WARRICK COUNTY PROSECUTOR, WASHINGTON COUNTY PROSECUTOR, WAYNE COUNTY PROSECUTOR, WELLS COUNTY PROSECUTOR, WHITE COUNTY PROSECUTOR, WHITLEY COUNTY PROSECUTOR, PROSECUTORS:, ADAMS COUNTY PROSECUTOR, ALLEN COUNTY PROSECUTOR, BARTHOLOMEW COUNTY PROSECUTOR, BENTON COUNTY PROSECUTOR, BLACKFORD COUNTY PROSECUTOR, BOONE COUNTY PROSECUTOR, BROWN COUNTY PROSECUTOR, CARROLL COUNTY PROSECUTOR, CASS COUNTY PROSECUTOR, CLARK COUNTY PROSECUTOR, CLAY COUNTY PROSECUTOR, CLINTON COUNTY PROSECUTOR, CRAWFORD COUNTY PROSECUTOR, DAVIESS COUNTY PROSECUTOR, DEARBORN COUNTY PROSECUTOR, DECATUR COUNTY PROSECUTOR, DEKALB COUNTY PROSECUTOR, DELAWARE COUNTY PROSECUTOR, DUBOIS COUNTY PROSECUTOR, ELKHART COUNTY PROSECUTOR, FAYETTE COUNTY PROSECUTOR, FLOYD COUNTY PROSECUTOR, FOUNTAIN COUNTY PROSECUTOR, FRANKLIN COUNTY PROSECUTOR, FULTON COUNTY PROSECUTOR, GIBSON COUNTY PROSECUTOR, GRANT COUNTY PROSECUTOR, GREENE COUNTY PROSECUTOR, HAMILTON COUNTY PROSECUTOR, HANCOCK COUNTY PROSECUTOR, HARRISON COUNTY PROSECUTOR, HENDRICKS COUNTY PROSECUTOR, HENRY COUNTY PROSECUTOR, HOWARD COUNTY PROSECUTOR, HUNTINGTON COUNTY PROSECUTOR, JACKSON COUNTY PROSECUTOR, JASPER COUNTY PROSECUTOR, JAY COUNTY PROSECUTOR, JEFFERSON COUNTY PROSECUTOR, JENNINGS COUNTY PROSECUTOR, JOHNSON COUNTY PROSECUTOR, KNOX COUNTY PROSECUTOR, KOSCIUSKO COUNTY PROSECUTOR, LAGRANGE COUNTY PROSECUTOR, LAKE COUNTY PROSECUTOR, LA PORTE COUNTY PROSECUTOR, LAWRENCE COUNTY PROSECUTOR, MADISON COUNTY PROSECUTOR, MARION COUNTY PROSECUTOR, MARSHALL COUNTY PROSECUTOR, MARTIN COUNTY PROSECUTOR. (Arthur, David)
May 23, 2008 23 NOTICE Submission of Affidavits and Declarations in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment or, alternatively, Motion for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Plaintiffs FREEDOM TO READ FOUNDATION, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF RECORDING MERCHANDISERS, GREAT LAKES BOOKSELLERS ASSOCIATION, INDIANAPOLIS MUSEUM OF ART, INDIANAPOLIS DOWNTOWN ARTISTS AND DEALERS ASSOCIATION, BIG HAT BOOKS, BOXCAR BOOKS AND COMMUNITY CENTER, INC., AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF INDIANA FOUNDATION, AMERICAN BOOKSELLERS FOUNDATION FOR FREE EXPRESSION, ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN PUBLISHERS, ENTERTAINMENT MERCHANTS ASSOCIATION (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit E. Barden, # 2 Affidavit A. Friedman, # 3 Declaration- C. Finan, # 4 Declaration- A. Adler, # 5 Declaration - S. Bersell, # 6 Declaration- J. Krug, # 7 Declaration- J. Dana, # 8 Declaration- J. Lyonr, # 9 Affidavit M. Anderson, # 10 Affidavit J. Zickler, # 11 Affidavit W. Harrington) (Falk, Kenneth)
May 23, 2008 22 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re 10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed by Plaintiffs FREEDOM TO READ FOUNDATION, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF RECORDING MERCHANDISERS, GREAT LAKES BOOKSELLERS ASSOCIATION, INDIANAPOLIS MUSEUM OF ART, INDIANAPOLIS DOWNTOWN ARTISTS AND DEALERS ASSOCIATION, BIG HAT BOOKS, BOXCAR BOOKS AND COMMUNITY CENTER, INC., AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF INDIANA FOUNDATION, AMERICAN BOOKSELLERS FOUNDATION FOR FREE EXPRESSION, ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN PUBLISHERS, ENTERTAINMENT MERCHANTS ASSOCIATION. (Falk, Kenneth)
May 23, 2008 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed by Plaintiffs FREEDOM TO READ FOUNDATION, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF RECORDING MERCHANDISERS, GREAT LAKES BOOKSELLERS ASSOCIATION, INDIANAPOLIS MUSEUM OF ART, INDIANAPOLIS DOWNTOWN ARTISTS AND DEALERS ASSOCIATION, BIG HAT BOOKS, BOXCAR BOOKS AND COMMUNITY CENTER, INC., AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF INDIANA FOUNDATION, AMERICAN BOOKSELLERS FOUNDATION FOR FREE EXPRESSION, ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN PUBLISHERS, ENTERTAINMENT MERCHANTS ASSOCIATION. (Falk, Kenneth)
May 19, 2008 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to WELLS COUNTY PROSECUTOR on 5/14/2008. (PG)
May 19, 2008 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to WARRICK COUNTY PROSECUTOR on 5/15/2008. (PG)
May 13, 2008 18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sarah Evans Barker: Scheduling Conference held on 5/13/2008, Plaintiffs Dispositive Motions due by 5/23/2008; Defendants Response shall be filed by 6/6/08; Plaintiffs Reply by 6/12/08 (See Order). (MAC)
May 13, 2008 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric James Beaver on behalf of Defendants MIAMI COUNTY PROSECUTOR, MONROE COUNTY PROSECUTOR, MONTGOMERY COUNTY PROSECUTOR, MORGAN COUNTY PROSECUTOR, NEWTON COUNTY PROSECUTOR, NOBLE COUNTY PROSECUTOR, OHIO COUNTY PROSECUTOR, ORANGE COUNTY PROSECUTOR, OWEN COUNTY PROSECUTOR, PARKE COUNTY PROSECUTOR, PERRY COUNTY PROSECUTOR, PIKE COUNTY PROSECUTOR, PORTER COUNTY PROSECUTOR, POSEY COUNTY PROSECUTOR, PULASKI COUNTY PROSECUTOR, PUTNAM COUNTY PROSECUTOR, RANDOLPH COUNTY PROSECUTOR, RIPLEY COUNTY PROSECUTOR, RUSH COUNTY PROSECUTOR, ST. JOSEPH COUNTY PROSECUTOR, SCOTT COUNTY PROSECUTOR, SHELBY COUNTY PROSECUTOR, SPENCER COUNTY PROSECUTOR, STARKE COUNTY PROSECUTOR, STEUBEN COUNTY PROSECUTOR, SULLIVAN COUNTY PROSECUTOR, SWITZERLAND COUNTY PROSECUTOR, TIPPECANOE COUNTY PROSECUTOR, TIPTON COUNTY PROSECUTOR, UNION COUNTY PROSECUTOR, VANDERBURGH COUNTY PROSECUTOR, VERMILLION COUNTY PROSECUTOR, VIGO COUNTY PROSECUTOR, WABASH COUNTY PROSECUTOR, WARREN COUNTY PROSECUTOR, WARRICK COUNTY PROSECUTOR, WASHINGTON COUNTY PROSECUTOR, WAYNE COUNTY PROSECUTOR, WELLS COUNTY PROSECUTOR, WHITE COUNTY PROSECUTOR, WHITLEY COUNTY PROSECUTOR, PROSECUTORS:, ADAMS COUNTY PROSECUTOR, ALLEN COUNTY PROSECUTOR, BARTHOLOMEW COUNTY PROSECUTOR, BENTON COUNTY PROSECUTOR, BLACKFORD COUNTY PROSECUTOR, BOONE COUNTY PROSECUTOR, BROWN COUNTY PROSECUTOR, CARROLL COUNTY PROSECUTOR, CASS COUNTY PROSECUTOR, CLARK COUNTY PROSECUTOR, CLAY COUNTY PROSECUTOR, CLINTON COUNTY PROSECUTOR, CRAWFORD COUNTY PROSECUTOR, DAVIESS COUNTY PROSECUTOR, DEARBORN COUNTY PROSECUTOR, DECATUR COUNTY PROSECUTOR, DEKALB COUNTY PROSECUTOR, DELAWARE COUNTY PROSECUTOR, DUBOIS COUNTY PROSECUTOR, ELKHART COUNTY PROSECUTOR, FAYETTE COUNTY PROSECUTOR, FLOYD COUNTY PROSECUTOR, FOUNTAIN COUNTY PROSECUTOR, FRANKLIN COUNTY PROSECUTOR, FULTON COUNTY PROSECUTOR, GIBSON COUNTY PROSECUTOR, GRANT COUNTY PROSECUTOR, GREENE COUNTY PROSECUTOR, HAMILTON COUNTY PROSECUTOR, HANCOCK COUNTY PROSECUTOR, HARRISON COUNTY PROSECUTOR, HENDRICKS COUNTY PROSECUTOR, HENRY COUNTY PROSECUTOR, HOWARD COUNTY PROSECUTOR, HUNTINGTON COUNTY PROSECUTOR, JACKSON COUNTY PROSECUTOR, JASPER COUNTY PROSECUTOR, JAY COUNTY PROSECUTOR, JEFFERSON COUNTY PROSECUTOR, JENNINGS COUNTY PROSECUTOR, JOHNSON COUNTY PROSECUTOR, KNOX COUNTY PROSECUTOR, KOSCIUSKO COUNTY PROSECUTOR, LAGRANGE COUNTY PROSECUTOR, LAKE COUNTY PROSECUTOR, LA PORTE COUNTY PROSECUTOR, LAWRENCE COUNTY PROSECUTOR, MADISON COUNTY PROSECUTOR, MARION COUNTY PROSECUTOR, MARSHALL COUNTY PROSECUTOR, MARTIN COUNTY PROSECUTOR. (Beaver, Eric)
May 13, 2008 16 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Arthur on behalf of Defendants MIAMI COUNTY PROSECUTOR, MONROE COUNTY PROSECUTOR, MONTGOMERY COUNTY PROSECUTOR, MORGAN COUNTY PROSECUTOR, NEWTON COUNTY PROSECUTOR, NOBLE COUNTY PROSECUTOR, OHIO COUNTY PROSECUTOR, ORANGE COUNTY PROSECUTOR, OWEN COUNTY PROSECUTOR, PARKE COUNTY PROSECUTOR, PERRY COUNTY PROSECUTOR, PIKE COUNTY PROSECUTOR, PORTER COUNTY PROSECUTOR, POSEY COUNTY PROSECUTOR, PULASKI COUNTY PROSECUTOR, PUTNAM COUNTY PROSECUTOR, RANDOLPH COUNTY PROSECUTOR, RIPLEY COUNTY PROSECUTOR, RUSH COUNTY PROSECUTOR, ST. JOSEPH COUNTY PROSECUTOR, SCOTT COUNTY PROSECUTOR, SHELBY COUNTY PROSECUTOR, SPENCER COUNTY PROSECUTOR, STARKE COUNTY PROSECUTOR, STEUBEN COUNTY PROSECUTOR, SULLIVAN COUNTY PROSECUTOR, SWITZERLAND COUNTY PROSECUTOR, TIPPECANOE COUNTY PROSECUTOR, TIPTON COUNTY PROSECUTOR, UNION COUNTY PROSECUTOR, VANDERBURGH COUNTY PROSECUTOR, VERMILLION COUNTY PROSECUTOR, VIGO COUNTY PROSECUTOR, WABASH COUNTY PROSECUTOR, WARREN COUNTY PROSECUTOR, WARRICK COUNTY PROSECUTOR, WASHINGTON COUNTY PROSECUTOR, WAYNE COUNTY PROSECUTOR, WELLS COUNTY PROSECUTOR, WHITE COUNTY PROSECUTOR, WHITLEY COUNTY PROSECUTOR, PROSECUTORS:, ADAMS COUNTY PROSECUTOR, ALLEN COUNTY PROSECUTOR, BARTHOLOMEW COUNTY PROSECUTOR, BENTON COUNTY PROSECUTOR, BLACKFORD COUNTY PROSECUTOR, BOONE COUNTY PROSECUTOR, BROWN COUNTY PROSECUTOR, CARROLL COUNTY PROSECUTOR, CASS COUNTY PROSECUTOR, CLARK COUNTY PROSECUTOR, CLAY COUNTY PROSECUTOR, CLINTON COUNTY PROSECUTOR, CRAWFORD COUNTY PROSECUTOR, DAVIESS COUNTY PROSECUTOR, DEARBORN COUNTY PROSECUTOR, DECATUR COUNTY PROSECUTOR, DEKALB COUNTY PROSECUTOR, DELAWARE COUNTY PROSECUTOR, DUBOIS COUNTY PROSECUTOR, ELKHART COUNTY PROSECUTOR, FAYETTE COUNTY PROSECUTOR, FLOYD COUNTY PROSECUTOR, FOUNTAIN COUNTY PROSECUTOR, FRANKLIN COUNTY PROSECUTOR, FULTON COUNTY PROSECUTOR, GIBSON COUNTY PROSECUTOR, GRANT COUNTY PROSECUTOR, GREENE COUNTY PROSECUTOR, HAMILTON COUNTY PROSECUTOR, HANCOCK COUNTY PROSECUTOR, HARRISON COUNTY PROSECUTOR, HENDRICKS COUNTY PROSECUTOR, HENRY COUNTY PROSECUTOR, HOWARD COUNTY PROSECUTOR, HUNTINGTON COUNTY PROSECUTOR, JACKSON COUNTY PROSECUTOR, JASPER COUNTY PROSECUTOR, JAY COUNTY PROSECUTOR, JEFFERSON COUNTY PROSECUTOR, JENNINGS COUNTY PROSECUTOR, JOHNSON COUNTY PROSECUTOR, KNOX COUNTY PROSECUTOR, KOSCIUSKO COUNTY PROSECUTOR, LAGRANGE COUNTY PROSECUTOR, LAKE COUNTY PROSECUTOR, LA PORTE COUNTY PROSECUTOR, LAWRENCE COUNTY PROSECUTOR, MADISON COUNTY PROSECUTOR, MARION COUNTY PROSECUTOR, MARSHALL COUNTY PROSECUTOR, MARTIN COUNTY PROSECUTOR. (Arthur, David)
May 12, 2008 15 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER: Attorney Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 5/13/2008 03:30 PM before Judge Sarah Evans Barker. Attorneys to call court at 317-229-3962. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 5/12/2008.(PGS)
May 8, 2008 14 Featured Case ORDER granting 8 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Michael A. Bamberger for FREEDOM TO READ FOUNDATION, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF RECORDING MERCHANDISERS, GREAT LAKES BOOKSELLERS ASSOCIATION, AMERICAN BOOKSELLERS FOUNDATION FOR FREE EXPRESSION, ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN PUBLISHERS and ENTERTAINMENT MERCHANTS ASSOCIATION added cm. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 5/8/08. (MAC)
May 8, 2008 13 Reassignment of Case to Judge Sarah Evans Barker. Judge Larry J. McKinney no longer assigned to the case. Please include the new case number, 1:08-cv-0596-SEB-TAB, on all future filings in this matter. (DH)
May 7, 2008 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon Laramore on behalf of Plaintiffs INDIANAPOLIS MUSEUM OF ART, INDIANAPOLIS DOWNTOWN ARTISTS AND DEALERS ASSOCIATION. (Laramore, Jon)
May 7, 2008 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Thomas Albaugh on behalf of Plaintiffs INDIANAPOLIS MUSEUM OF ART, INDIANAPOLIS DOWNTOWN ARTISTS AND DEALERS ASSOCIATION. (Albaugh, Matthew)
May 7, 2008 10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Plaintiffs FREEDOM TO READ FOUNDATION, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF RECORDING MERCHANDISERS, GREAT LAKES BOOKSELLERS ASSOCIATION, INDIANAPOLIS MUSEUM OF ART, INDIANAPOLIS DOWNTOWN ARTISTS AND DEALERS ASSOCIATION, BIG HAT BOOKS, BOXCAR BOOKS AND COMMUNITY CENTER, INC., AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF INDIANA FOUNDATION, AMERICAN BOOKSELLERS FOUNDATION FOR FREE EXPRESSION, ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN PUBLISHERS, ENTERTAINMENT MERCHANTS ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Falk, Kenneth)
May 7, 2008 9 RECEIPT #IP006933 in the amount of $30.00 for pro hac vice fee. (DH)
May 7, 2008 8 MOTION to Appear pro hac vice (Michael A. Bamberger) filed by Plaintiffs, FREEDOM TO READ FOUNDATION, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF RECORDING MERCHANDISERS, GREAT LAKES BOOKSELLERS ASSOCIATION, AMERICAN BOOKSELLERS FOUNDATION FOR FREE EXPRESSION, ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN PUBLISHERS, and ENTERTAINMENT MERCHANTS ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DH)
May 7, 2008 7 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DH)
May 7, 2008 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth J. Falk on behalf of Plaintiffs, BIG HAT BOOKS, BOXCAR BOOKS AND COMMUNITY CENTER, INC., and AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF INDIANA FOUNDATION. (DH)
May 7, 2008 5 NOTICE of Lawsuit & Request for Waiver of Service for Summons Supplied by all plaintiffs. (DH)
May 7, 2008 4 Summons Issued as to Office Of The Indiana Attorney General. (DH)
May 7, 2008 3 RECEIPT #IP006932 in the amount of $350.00 for filing fee. (DH)
May 7, 2008 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs, FREEDOM TO READ FOUNDATION, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF RECORDING MERCHANDISERS, GREAT LAKES BOOKSELLERS ASSOCIATION, INDIANAPOLIS MUSEUM OF ART, INDIANAPOLIS DOWNTOWN ARTISTS AND DEALERS ASSOCIATION, BIG HAT BOOKS, BOXCAR BOOKS AND COMMUNITY CENTER, INC., AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF INDIANA FOUNDATION, AMERICAN BOOKSELLERS FOUNDATION FOR FREE EXPRESSION, ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN PUBLISHERS, and ENTERTAINMENT MERCHANTS ASSOCIATION. (DH)
May 7, 2008 1 COMPLAINT against all defendants filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-statute)(DH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BIG HAT BOOKS et al v. PROSECUTORS:
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BIG HAT BOOKS
Represented By: Kenneth J. Falk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BOXCAR BOOKS AND COMMUNITY CENTER, INC.
Represented By: Kenneth J. Falk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF INDIANA FOUNDATION
Represented By: Kenneth J. Falk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMERICAN BOOKSELLERS FOUNDATION FOR FREE EXPRESSION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN PUBLISHERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ENTERTAINMENT MERCHANTS ASSOCIATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FREEDOM TO READ FOUNDATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF RECORDING MERCHANDISERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GREAT LAKES BOOKSELLERS ASSOCIATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INDIANAPOLIS MUSEUM OF ART
Represented By: Jon Laramore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INDIANAPOLIS DOWNTOWN ARTISTS AND DEALERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Jon Laramore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PROSECUTORS:
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?