AGRIGENETICS, INC. v. PIONEER HI-BRED INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Plaintiff: AGRIGENETICS, INC.
Defendant: PIONEER HI-BRED INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Case Number: 1:2008cv00802
Filed: June 13, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Marion
Presiding Judge: Tim A. Baker
Presiding Judge: Richard L. Young
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 354 ENTRY on Plaintiff's Request that the Court Order Defendant to Present Defendant-Controlled Witnesses for Testimony During Plaintiff's Case. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 1/6/2011. (See Entry for details)(TRG)
December 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 314 ORDER on Defendant's 216 Renewed Motion to Exclude the Opinion Testimony of Dr. Jennifer Vanderhart - Pioneer's motion to exclude Vanderhart's opinion testimony [Docket No. 216] is GRANTED TO THE EXTENT that Vanderhart may not testif y regarding any damages calculation including Monsanto Roundup Ready royalties, germplasm royalties, or the "Mon Royalty" settlement amounts. If Mycogen wishes to have Vanderhart testify on this limited basis, Mycogen shall provide Pioneer with a supplemental report complying with this order before 5 p.m. on January 4, 2011 (**SEE ORDER**). Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 12/30/2010. (JD)
December 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 296 ENTRY denying as moot 251 Motion to Dismiss Agrigenetics' Claim for Monsanto Damages for Lack of Standing. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 12/23/2010. (TRG)
December 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 265 AMENDED Entry on Plaintiff's Partial Motion for Summary Judgment - The Court GRANTS Mycogen's 49 Motion for a Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 12/16/2010.(TRG)
December 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 214 DISCOVERY ORDER: This case is set for trial on January 10, 2011, yet Plaintiff Mycogen seeks to revisit discovery on two separate fronts. First, Mycogen moved to compel trial depositions of two out-of-state witnesses. [Docket No. 161.] Second, Myc ogen moved to reopen discovery relating to Pioneer's royalty payments to Monsanto. [Docket No. 164.] Defendant Pioneer vehemently objects to both motions. The Court held a telephonic conference on these motions on December 6. Both parties we re given a full opportunity to be heard, which was in addition to the fairly extensive briefing these motions have generated. Mycogen's motions 161 and 164 are denied. Mycogen shall supplement its responses to Pioneer's request for production number 24 w/i seven days (see Order for other details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker.(SWM)
November 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER denying Pltf's 88 Sealed Motion to Exclude Expert Report; denying Pltf's 91 Sealed Motion to Exclude Expert Report; denying Deft's 93 Sealed Motion to Exclude Expert Report (see Order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 11/10/2010. (SWM)
November 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ***SEE AMENDED ENTRY 265 *** UNSEALED PER ORDER DATED 11/16/2010 *** ORDER granting 49 Mycongen Seeds' Sealed Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. For the reasons set forth in the Entry Plantiff is GRANTED Partial Summary Judgment. (See Entry) Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 11/9/2010. (JD) Modified on 11/9/2010 (TRG). Modified on 11/16/2010 (SWM). Modified on 12/16/2010 (TRG). Modified on 12/16/2010 (TRG).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AGRIGENETICS, INC. v. PIONEER HI-BRED INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AGRIGENETICS, INC.
Represented By: Hongsun Yoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PIONEER HI-BRED INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?