BOWERS v. GAUNT et al
Plaintiff: EUGENE BOWERS
Defendant: THOMAS J. GAUNT and DONALD R. LUNDBERG
Case Number: 1:2008cv01088
Filed: August 11, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Office: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition) Office
County: Madison
Presiding Judge: Tim A. Baker
Presiding Judge: David Frank Hamilton
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ENTRY. This cause is before the court on plaintiff's objection to the 4/3/09 ruling denying his motion for judgment to award him the dollar amount sought in civil rights complaint. Plaintiff seeks recusal of the undersigned and assignment of M agistrate Judge. Legally incorrect rulings are proper grounds for appeal, not recusal. Although the plaintiff has failed to demonstrate any legally incorrect rulings in this action, his appeal from the disposition has been docketed in the Court of Appeals and is proceeding. This provides the proper forum in which his arguments can be addressed. His objection to the ruling of 4/3/09 (dkt. 31), treated as a request for recusal of the assigned judicial officers,is DENIED. Signed by Judge David Frank Hamilton on 5/4/2009. c/m. (LBK)
February 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ENTRY DISCUSSING POST-JUDGMENT OBJECTION TO DISPOSITION OF ACTION. Plaintiff's motion to alter or amend judgment (dkt 19) is DENIED. Signed by Judge David Frank Hamilton on 2/12/2009. c/m. (LBK)
December 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENTRY DISMISSING CLAIMS AND DIRECTING FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. Applying the standards discussed herein, the court dismisses any claim based on actions or inactions the unlawfulness of which would render the plaintiff's conviction or sentence for ar med robbery in cause number 49G02-0008-CF-149750, Marion Superior Court, invalid. No partial final judgment shall issue at this time as to the claims resolved in this Entry. The plaintiff shall have through December 19, 2008, in which to file a stat ement of remaining claims as to any claims he intends to assert in this action which have not been dismissed as legally insufficient in this Entry. If no such report is entered, or if the report does not identify claims which may proceed, the court will direct the entry of final judgment in conformity with the ruling in this Entry. The clerk shall update the docket to reflect plaintiff's current address. Signed by Judge David Frank Hamilton on 12/8/2008. c/m. (LBK)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BOWERS v. GAUNT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EUGENE BOWERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS J. GAUNT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONALD R. LUNDBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?