INDIANA PROTECTION AND ADVOCACY SERVICES COMMISSION v. COMMISSIONER, INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTION
Plaintiff: INDIANA PROTECTION AND ADVOCACY SERVICES COMMISSION
Defendant: COMMISSIONER, INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTION
Case Number: 1:2008cv01317
Filed: October 1, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Marion
Presiding Judge: David Frank Hamilton
Presiding Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 509 CLOSED JUDGMENT - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the Private Settlement Agreement will remain actively in effect for three (3) years from the date of this Order. At that time, absent written agreement as noted in paragraph 71 of the Private Settleme nt Agreement, this case will automatically be dismissed without prejudice. AND IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, inasmuch as all claims have been resolved against all parties, this Entry shall constitute the Final Judgment in this action and through its issuance the action shall be dismissed without prejudice, subject to all the provisions of the Private Settlement Agreement, which is approved and incorporated herein. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 3/24/2016.(JLS)
July 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 442 ENTRY - The filings of Mr. Farmer [dkt 400 ] and Mr. Harwood [dkt 430 ] are DENIED. Copies Mailed. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 7/1/2015. (MGG)
December 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ENTRY FOLLOWING BENCH TRIAL - The Plaintiffs have prevailed as to their Eighth Amendment claim. Appropriate further proceedings will be conducted as to the relief to which the Plaintiffs are entitled and as to any ancillary matters. For now, no partial final judgment shall issue at this time as to the claim resolved in this Entry. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 12/31/2012.(TRG)
October 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 262 Entry Discussing Motion filed by Leroy Jeffers: For the reasons explained above, therefore, Mr. Jeffers is not entitled to the relief sought in his motion to commute sentence, and that motion 249 is denied ***SEE ENTRY FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION***. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 10/31/2011. (DW)
June 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ENTRY granting 182 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Kathryn Burns. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 6/28/2011. (JD)
July 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ENTRY ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. For the reasons discussed herein, Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 22 is DENIED. Signed by Judge David Frank Hamilton on 7/21/2009. (LBK)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: INDIANA PROTECTION AND ADVOCACY SERVICES COMMISSION v. COMMISSIONER, INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INDIANA PROTECTION AND ADVOCACY SERVICES COMMISSION
Represented By: David R. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER, INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?