HARDY v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Plaintiff: PRESTON HARDY
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2009cv00986
Filed: August 11, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Office: Indianapolis Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Tim A. Baker
Presiding Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 168 AMENDED ENTRY - This Amended Entry is issued to correct an error on page 11 of the original Entry at Docket No. 166. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Becker Landscape Contractors, Inc. were dismissed on October 11, 2011, so those claims do not remain pending in this court. This Amended Entry is otherwise identical to the original Entry. *** SEE ENTRY ***. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 9/21/2012.(CKM)
September 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER - granting 121 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. The Court GRANTS Defendant GW's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint with respect to the claim asserted against GW. Accordingly, Plaintiff's claim ag ainst Defendant GW Commercial Services, Inc. is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiff's claim against Defendants Becker and the United States, however, remains pending in this court. Judgment in accordance with this entry shall now issue, there being no just reason to delay, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54(b). Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 9/19/2012. (CKM)
July 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker: Parties appeared by counsel July 1, 2010, for a discovery hearing. Plaintiff's motion for leave to file more than 25 interrogatories [Docket No. 28] is granted. Plaintiff's motion to compel [Docket No. 29] is granted in part and denied in part. (See Order). Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. (TMA)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HARDY v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PRESTON HARDY
Represented By: Stanley Kahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?