COOK et al v. COUNTRY VIEW FAMILY FARMS, LLC et al
Case Number: 1:2009cv01567
Filed: December 21, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Office: Indianapolis Office
Presiding Judge: William T. Lawrence
Presiding Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR COSTS: Accordingly, the Plaintiffs' motion is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART, and the Defendants shall pay the Plaintiffs $9501.58 ***SEE ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION***. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 4/30/2013. (DW)
September 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ENTRY ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT: For the reasons set forth above, the Defendants' motion for summary judgment is GRANTED in its entirety. Judgment will be entered in favor of the Defendants on all of the Plaintiffs' claims ***SEE ENTRY FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION***. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 9/13/2012. (DW)
March 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ENTRY ON MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF JIMMY COOK: The Defendants' objections are overruled and Cook's motion 68 is GRANTED. Plaintiff Jimmy Cook's claims in this case are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The parties shall hereafter conform the caption in this cause to reflect that Ralph Dalzell, Sr., is now the first named plaintiff ***SEE ENTRY FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION***. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 3/24/2011.(DWH) Modified on 3/24/2011 (DWH).
December 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 75 Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker: Discovery Hearing held on 12/14/2010. The parties appeared by counsel on December 14, 2010, to address ongoing issues regarding Plaintiffs' responses to Defendant The Cleme ns Family Corporations discovery requests, originally served on June 18, 2010. Clemens first raised these discovery issues with the Court during an October 4, 2010, status conference, after which the Court ordered the Plaintiffs to supplement their responses by October 25. Plaintiffs supplemented their responses, but alleged deficiencies in these responses prompted the most recent discovery squabble and the December 14 hearing. The Court concludes that Plaintiffs must further supplement their responses to Clemens's discovery requests. Plaintiffs shall fully comply with this order by January 3, 2011. Failure to fully comply with this order may subject Plaintiffs to reimbursing Clemens attorney's fees and/or costs necessitated by further efforts to obtain compliance, among other sanctions (see Order). Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker.(SWM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COOK et al v. COUNTRY VIEW FAMILY FARMS, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?