ONE NUMBER CORPORATION v. GOOGLE INC. Featured Case
Plaintiff: ONE NUMBER CORPORATION
Defendant: GOOGLE INC.
Case Number: 1:2010cv00312
Filed: March 16, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Office: Indianapolis Office
Presiding Judge: Tim A. Baker
Presiding Judge: Richard L. Young
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting Deft's 28 Motion to Stay proceedings pending re-examination of the patents-in-suit (see Order). Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 2/15/2011. (SWM)
December 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER denying 30 Motion for Discovery. However, the Court expects it would allow more narrowly tailored discovery, and counsel shall confer in good faith in an attempt to agree on these parameters. If agreement cannot be reached,counsel shall notify the Magistrate Judge's staff, and this matter will be set for a prompt hearing. Three business days prior to any such hearing Plaintiff shall file any remaining discovery requests. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 12/22/2010. (JD)
November 30, 2010 Filing 35 REPLY in Support of Motion re 30 MOTION for Discovery to Take Limited Expedited Written Discovery, filed by Plaintiff ONE NUMBER CORPORATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Internet Snapshot, # 2 Exhibit B Supplemental Declaration of Brandon McLarty)(Warr, Alastair)
November 23, 2010 Filing 34 RESPONSE in Opposition re 30 MOTION for Discovery to Take Limited Expedited Written Discovery, filed by Defendant GOOGLE INC.. (Barron, Jeff)
November 22, 2010 Filing 33 REPLY in Support of Motion re 28 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Inter Parties Reexamination of the Patents-in-Suit, filed by Defendant GOOGLE INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex 8- One Number Website Printout)(Barron, Jeff)
November 11, 2010 Filing 32 RESPONSE in Opposition re 28 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Inter Parties Reexamination, filed by Plaintiff ONE NUMBER CORPORATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Inter Partes Reexamination Data, # 2 Exhibit B Internet Page Snapshot, # 3 Exhibit C Communications from US Patent Office, # 4 Exhibit D Internet Page Snapshot, # 5 Exhibit E Internet News Stories of Acqusition of GrandCentral by Google)(Warr, Alastair)
November 11, 2010 Filing 31 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re 30 MOTION for Discovery to Take Limited Expedited Written Discovery, filed by Plaintiff ONE NUMBER CORPORATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B Declaration of Brandon McLarty, # 2 Exhibit C Web Site Snapshot, # 3 Exhibit D Web Site Snapshot)(Warr, Alastair)
November 11, 2010 Filing 30 MOTION for Discovery to Take Limited Expedited Written Discovery, filed by Plaintiff ONE NUMBER CORPORATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A First Request for Production of Documents and Things to Google, Inc., # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Warr, Alastair)
November 2, 2010 Filing 29 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re 28 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Inter Parties Reexamination, filed by Defendant GOOGLE INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 7)(Barron, Jeff)
November 2, 2010 Filing 28 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Inter Parties Reexamination, filed by Defendant GOOGLE INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Barron, Jeff)
August 11, 2010 Filing 27 ANSWER to the Counterclaims of Google, Inc., filed by Counter Defendant ONE NUMBER CORPORATION. (Warr, Alastair)
July 26, 2010 Filing 26 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GOOGLE INC.. (Schuster, Jennifer)
July 23, 2010 Filing 25 Google Inc.'s ANSWER to 1 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against ONE NUMBER CORPORATION, filed by GOOGLE INC..(Vare, Todd)
July 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting deft's 23 Motion for Extension of Time to File response to complaint to 7/23/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 7/15/2010. (SWM)
July 8, 2010 Filing 23 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to July 23, 2010 in which to 1 Complaint, filed by Defendant GOOGLE INC., Plaintiff ONE NUMBER CORPORATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Vare, Todd)
June 28, 2010 Filing 22 MARGINAL ENTRY denying as moot Parties' 20 Joint Motion for Extension of Time for deft to respond to pltf's complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 6/28/2010. (SWM)
June 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting Parties' 19 Joint Motion for Extension of Time for deft to respond to pltf's complaint to 7/9/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 6/27/2010. (SWM)
June 21, 2010 Filing 20 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to 07/09/2010 to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint, filed by Defendant GOOGLE INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Vare, Todd)
June 18, 2010 Filing 19 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to July 9, 2010 in which to 1 Complaint, filed by Defendant GOOGLE INC., Plaintiff ONE NUMBER CORPORATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Vare, Todd)
June 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting 17 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to 6/25/2010 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 6/1/2010. (LBK)
May 28, 2010 Filing 17 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to 6/25/10 for Defendant to Answer of Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, filed by Defendant GOOGLE INC., Plaintiff ONE NUMBER CORPORATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barron, Jeff)
May 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting deft's 15 Motion for Extension of Time to File response to complaint to 6/3/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 5/7/2010. (SWM)
April 28, 2010 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to 6/3/2010 to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, filed by Defendant GOOGLE INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barron, Jeff)
April 7, 2010 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Lynn Schuster on behalf of Defendant GOOGLE INC.. (Schuster, Jennifer)
April 1, 2010 Filing 13 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant GOOGLE INC.. (Barron, Jeff)
April 1, 2010 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeff M. Barron on behalf of Defendant GOOGLE INC.. (Barron, Jeff)
April 1, 2010 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd G. Vare on behalf of Defendant GOOGLE INC.. (Vare, Todd)
March 19, 2010 Filing 10 RETURN of Personal Service, filed by ONE NUMBER CORPORATION. GOOGLE INC. served on 3/17/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Affidavit of Service)(Warr, Alastair)
March 18, 2010 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Birk K. Billingsley on behalf of Plaintiff ONE NUMBER CORPORATION. (Billingsley, Birk)
March 18, 2010 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Stuart Morrisson on behalf of Plaintiff ONE NUMBER CORPORATION. (Morrisson, Scott)
March 16, 2010 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ONE NUMBER CORPORATION. (JD)
March 16, 2010 Filing 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JD)
March 16, 2010 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Dean E. McConnell on behalf of Plaintiff ONE NUMBER CORPORATION. (JD)
March 16, 2010 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to GOOGLE INC. (JD)
March 16, 2010 Filing 3 RECEIPT #IP017222 in the amount of $ 350.00 (JD)
March 16, 2010 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET, filed by Plaintiff ONE NUMBER CORPORATION. (JD)
March 16, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GOOGLE INC. with Jury Demand, filed by ONE NUMBER CORPORATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1- '565 Patent, # 2 Exhibit 2- '256 Patent, # 3 Exhibit 3- July 11, 2007 Communication to GrandCentral and Google, # 4 Exhibit 4- Google Voice Services)(JD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ONE NUMBER CORPORATION v. GOOGLE INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOOGLE INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ONE NUMBER CORPORATION
Represented By: Dean E. McConnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?