SHULL v. CAST et al
Plaintiff: FREDERICK H. SHULL, JR.
Defendant: WILLIAM R. CAST, PHILIP N. ESKEW, JR., STEPHEN L. FERGUSON, JACK M. GILL, INDIANA UNIVERSITY, THOMAS E. REILLY, JR., DERICA W. RICE, PATRICK A. SHOULDERS, ABBEY R. STEMLER and SUE H. TALBOT
Case Number: 1:2010cv00463
Filed: April 14, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Office: Indianapolis Office
Presiding Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Presiding Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ENTRY DISCUSSING MOTION TO DISMISS FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT - The Motion to Dismiss (Dkt 74 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. All claims against Indiana University are DISMISSED. All official capacity claims in which damages are sought are DISMISSED. Claims asserted in Counts 1-5, 7-17 of the Fourth Amended Complaint are DISMISSED. The claim in Count 6 shall proceed against the defendant individuals in their individual capacities only and for damages only. No partial final judgment shall issue at this time as to the claim(s) resolved in this Entry. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 9/19/2011. (JD)
August 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 97 Entry Discussing Selected Matters - Plaintiff's 83 Motion to Amend is GRANTED. The fourth amended complaint is amended by interlineation to reflect the changes noted in the motion. Plaintiff's 82 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is DENIED. The parties' attention is directed to the telephonic status conference set for September 20, 2011. Any proposed agenda pertaining to the telephonic status conference should be filed not later than September 8, 2011. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 8/25/2011. (JD)
August 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Entry Directing Filing of Third Amended Complaint: Shull shall have through September 22, 2010, in which to file a third amended complaint. Because there is no legally sufficient pleading setting forth Shull's claims, his motion for injunction 36 cannot be reasonably evaluated and is therefore denied ***SEE ENTRY***. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 8/10/2010. (DWH)
June 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER denying 21 Motion for appointment of Counsel (S.O.) cm. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 6/18/2010. (MAC)
May 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying 11 Motion for declaration of acceptable method of service of process; denying 13 Motion for confidential ex parte conference (S.O.) cm. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 5/27/2010. (MAC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SHULL v. CAST et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM R. CAST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILIP N. ESKEW, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEPHEN L. FERGUSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JACK M. GILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDIANA UNIVERSITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS E. REILLY, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DERICA W. RICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATRICK A. SHOULDERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABBEY R. STEMLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUE H. TALBOT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FREDERICK H. SHULL, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?