HAYWARD LEFORGE v. BAC HOME LOANS SERVICING, LP
Plaintiff: LUDA CHRISTINE HAYWARD LEFORGE
Defendant: BAC HOME LOANS SERVICING, LP
Case Number: 1:2010cv00859
Filed: July 6, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Office: Indianapolis Office
Presiding Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Presiding Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - The Magistrate Judge submitted her Report and Recommendation on Plaintiff's Motion to Order Settlement Paid to Court (Dkt. 107). The parties were afforded due opportunity pursuant to statute and the rules of this Court to file objections. Plaintiffs filed an objection and then withdrew their objection (Dkt. 111). The Court, having considered the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation, hereby adopts the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation. Plaintiffs' Motion to Order Settlement Paid to Court (Dkt. 103) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 3/11/2014.(CKM)
March 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ENTRY DISCUSSING PENDING MOTIONS - The Motion for Sanctions (Dkt. 87 ) and the Motion for Relief Pursuant to Rules 60(b) and 60(d)(3) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and to Amend the Complaint (Dkt. 90 ) are each DENIED. *SEE ENTRY*. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 3/27/2013. (JD)
April 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ENTRY ON MOTION TO DISMISS - For the reasons set forth, BAC's 26 Motion to Dismiss Counts C through F is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' claims for violations of the Fair Credit Reporting Act and the Fair Debt Collection Practices Act remain. **SEE ENTRY**. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 4/21/2011. (JD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HAYWARD LEFORGE v. BAC HOME LOANS SERVICING, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAC HOME LOANS SERVICING, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUDA CHRISTINE HAYWARD LEFORGE
Represented By: Robert E. Duff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?