HAYDEN et al v. GREENSBURG COMMUNITY SCHOOL BOARD MEMBERS et al

Plaintiff: MELISSA HAYDEN and PATRICK HAYDEN
Defendant: GREENSBURG COMMUNITY SCHOOL BOARD MEMBERS, TOM HUNTER, DAVE MEYER, STACY MEYER, AL MOORE, VALERIE MOORMAN, TONY OWENS, DEBBIE SMITH, DAVE STROUSE, STEVE TAYLOR, LISA TRESSLER and DAVID WEIGEL
Case Number: 1:2010cv01709
Filed: December 27, 2010
Court: Indiana Southern District Court
Office: Indianapolis Office
Referring Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Presiding Judge: Richard L. Young
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1343 Violation of Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 13, 2013 92 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. For the reasons set forth within (see Findings), the court finds in favor of the Defendants on all counts alleged in Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint. A judgment shall issue in favor of the Defendants and against the Plaintiffs in a separate document. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 3/13/2013.(PG)
October 23, 2012 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ENTRY granting Defendants' 83 Motion to Amend Answer. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 10/23/2012. (PG)
July 19, 2011 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ENTRY denying Plaintiffs' 13 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 7/19/2011. (PG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HAYDEN et al v. GREENSBURG COMMUNITY SCHOOL BOARD MEMBERS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREENSBURG COMMUNITY SCHOOL BOARD MEMBERS
Represented By: FROST BROWN TODD LLC
Represented By: William T. Hopkins, Jr.
Represented By: Jason Thomas Clagg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOM HUNTER
Represented By: Jason Thomas Clagg
Represented By: William T. Hopkins, Jr.
Represented By: FROST BROWN TODD LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVE MEYER
Represented By: Jason Thomas Clagg
Represented By: William T. Hopkins, Jr.
Represented By: FROST BROWN TODD LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STACY MEYER
Represented By: Jason Thomas Clagg
Represented By: William T. Hopkins, Jr.
Represented By: FROST BROWN TODD LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AL MOORE
Represented By: Jason Thomas Clagg
Represented By: William T. Hopkins, Jr.
Represented By: FROST BROWN TODD LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VALERIE MOORMAN
Represented By: Jason Thomas Clagg
Represented By: William T. Hopkins, Jr.
Represented By: FROST BROWN TODD LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TONY OWENS
Represented By: Jason Thomas Clagg
Represented By: William T. Hopkins, Jr.
Represented By: FROST BROWN TODD LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEBBIE SMITH
Represented By: Jason Thomas Clagg
Represented By: William T. Hopkins, Jr.
Represented By: FROST BROWN TODD LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVE STROUSE
Represented By: Jason Thomas Clagg
Represented By: William T. Hopkins, Jr.
Represented By: FROST BROWN TODD LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVE TAYLOR
Represented By: Jason Thomas Clagg
Represented By: William T. Hopkins, Jr.
Represented By: FROST BROWN TODD LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LISA TRESSLER
Represented By: Jason Thomas Clagg
Represented By: William T. Hopkins, Jr.
Represented By: FROST BROWN TODD LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID WEIGEL
Represented By: Jason Thomas Clagg
Represented By: William T. Hopkins, Jr.
Represented By: FROST BROWN TODD LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MELISSA HAYDEN
Represented By: Ronald William Frazier
Represented By: Thomas W. Blessing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICK HAYDEN
Represented By: Ronald William Frazier
Represented By: Thomas W. Blessing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?