KOLE et al v. FAULTLESS et al
Plaintiff: GLENN J. BROWN, MICHAEL R. KOLE and JOSEPH L. WEINGARTEN
Defendant: STUART EASLEY, FALL CREEK TOWNSHIP, SCOTT FAULTLESS, DAVID GEORGE, DANIEL HENKE, ARTHUR LEVINE, EILEEN PRITCHARD and TOWN COUNCIL OF FISHERS, INDIANA
Case Number: 1:2010cv01735
Filed: December 30, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Office: Indianapolis Office
Presiding Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Presiding Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 77 Adoption of Report and Recommendation and Certification of Question to the Indiana Supreme Court - The court, having considered the Magistrate Judge's Report and being duly advised, now approves and adopts the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation (Dkt. 76 ). The plaintiffs' motion (Dkt. 69 ) is therefore GRANTED as provided in the Report and Recommendation and this order. The Clerk of this Court shall transmit the items listed within to the Clerk of the Indiana Supreme Court. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 12/6/2011.(JD) Modified filed date on 12/7/2011 (JD).
November 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 76 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 69 Plaintiffs' MOTION to Reopen Case and to Certify Question of State Law to the Indiana Supreme Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 11/18/2011. (TMA)
September 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ENTRY on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Alternative Motion to Set a Bond on Plaintiffs' State Claims - Court DENIES Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' federal claims [Dkt. No. 21 ] and DENIES Defendants' Motion to set a Bond on Plaintiffs' state law claims. The Court will STAY proceedings here on the Plaintiffs' declaratory judgment claims, pending finality in the state court, and shall close this case administratively on the Court's docket during the pendency of the stay until such time as either party shall move to have it reopened. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 9/2/2011. (TRG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KOLE et al v. FAULTLESS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLENN J. BROWN
Represented By: Gary P. Price
Represented By: Steven Walter Griesemer
Represented By: Sara R. Blevins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL R. KOLE
Represented By: Gary P. Price
Represented By: Steven Walter Griesemer
Represented By: Sara R. Blevins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH L. WEINGARTEN
Represented By: Steven Walter Griesemer
Represented By: Sara R. Blevins
Represented By: Gary P. Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STUART EASLEY
Represented By: Mark Jason Crandley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FALL CREEK TOWNSHIP
Represented By: Kirk A. Horn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT FAULTLESS
Represented By: Mark Jason Crandley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID GEORGE
Represented By: Mark Jason Crandley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIEL HENKE
Represented By: Mark Jason Crandley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARTHUR LEVINE
Represented By: Mark Jason Crandley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EILEEN PRITCHARD
Represented By: Mark Jason Crandley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOWN COUNCIL OF FISHERS, INDIANA
Represented By: Mark Jason Crandley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?