BAYNHAM v. MERIDIAN SERVICES CORP
Plaintiff: MINNIE A. BAYNHAM
Defendant: MERIDIAN SERVICES CORP
Case Number: 1:2011cv00129
Filed: January 26, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Office: Indianapolis Office
Presiding Judge: Mark J. Dinsmore
Presiding Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ENTRY ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT - Meridian's Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. # 60 ) is GRANTED. A separate final judgment shall enter in favor of Meridian Services Corp. with costs. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 8/21/2012. (JD)
July 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER denying Pltf's 87 Motion to Strike (see Order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 7/16/2012. (SWM)
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting Pltf's 75 Motion to Withdraw Default Admissions (see Order). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 7/9/2012. (SWM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BAYNHAM v. MERIDIAN SERVICES CORP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MINNIE A. BAYNHAM
Represented By: Bobby Allen Potters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERIDIAN SERVICES CORP
Represented By: Jennifer J. Abrell
Represented By: Mark R. McKinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?