MOORE v. ASTRUE
Plaintiff: LAQUISHA J. MOORE
Defendant: MICHAEL J. ASTRUE
Miscellaneous: SSA (Court Use Only)
Case Number: 1:2011cv00247
Filed: February 17, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Office: Indianapolis Office
Presiding Judge: Mark J. Dinsmore
Presiding Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ENTRY ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES - The Court GRANTS in part and DENIES in part Ms. Moore's application for attorney fees (Dkt. 31 ). Ms. Moore originally requested fees for 33.25 hours in 2011 at a rate of $179.21 and for 2.5 hours in 2012 at a rate of $183.09, or a total of 35.75 hours. For the reasons explained, the Court will reduce the fees awarded by a total of 14.875 hours to 20.875 hours and the rate to $174.81 for both 2011 and 2012. The Court ORDERS the Commi ssioner to pay $3,649.16 to Ms. Moore's counsel, unless within thirty (30) days the Commissioner files a statement with the Court, along with supporting evidence, that Ms. Moore owes an outstanding debt to the government as of the date of the award and it will exercise its right of offset. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 12/30/2013. (JD)
October 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER on EAJA FEES-The Court ORDERS Mr. Mulvany to produce his records, computer-generated or handwritten, reflecting contemporaneous time entries for work performed in this matter on or before 21 Days from the date of this Order. The Court reminds counsel of the need to keep formal contemporaneous time sheets for future EAJA fee petitions as this may alleviate objections. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 10/1/2013.(CBU)
September 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ENTRY ON JUDICIAL REVIEW - The Commissioner's decision is REVERSED and REMANDED for further proceedings consistent with this opinion. *SEE ENTRY*. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 9/18/2012.(JD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MOORE v. ASTRUE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAQUISHA J. MOORE
Represented By: Patrick Harold Mulvany
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: SSA (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL J. ASTRUE
Represented By: Thomas E. Kieper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?