OYEBADE v. BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION
Plaintiff: ADENIRAN OYEBADE
Defendant: BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION
Case Number: 1:2011cv00968
Filed: July 20, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Office: Indianapolis Office
Presiding Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Presiding Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER - The Court DENIES Mr. Oyebade's Motion to Supplement Response/Answers to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. [Dkt. 153 .] Further, the Court GRANTS Boston Scientific's Motion for Summary Judgment, [dkt. 140 ], in full to the extent it relates to Mr. Oyebade's claims against it, GRANTS the motion on Boston Scientific's fraud counterclaim, DENIES AS MOOT the motion on Boston Scientific's constructive fraud counterclaim, and DENIES the motion on B oston Scientific's abuse of process counterclaim. The Court is unable to locate any information in Boston Scientific's briefs regarding the specific amount it seeks in connection with its fraud counterclaim. Boston Scientific is ORDERED t o submit a statement setting forth the specific amount of damages it seeks (i.e., the amount which corresponds with five days of bereavement leave) within ten days of the date of this Order. Mr. Oyebade may respond to any such statement within fourteen days of the filing of the statement, and Boston Scientific shall file any reply within seven days of Mr. Oyebade's response. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 6/28/2013. (copy to Plaintiff via US Mail) (JKS)
December 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER - Mr. Oyebade's Objection, [dkt. 113 ], is OVERRULED, and the Court adopts the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation, [dkt. 109 ]. To the extent that Boston Scientific's Motion to Dismiss or, Alternatively, for an Adv erse Inference Instruction and, in Either Case, for an Order Requiring Plaintiff to Pay Defendant's Attorneys' Fees and Costs, [dkt. 74 ], seeks sanctions other than dismissal, the Court ORDERS as follows: (***SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS***). Mr. Oyebade is strongly cautioned that any additional discovery misconduct may result in the dismissal of his claims with prejudice. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 12/21/2012. (copy to Plaintiff via US Mail)(JKS)
December 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - The Court adopts the Magistrate Judge's 126 Report and Recommendation. The defendant Boston Scientific Corporation's Motion for Fees and Expenses (Dkt. No. 114 ) is GRANTED. The defendant is awarded fees and expenses of $2,629.54, to be paid within 30 days of this Order. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 12/11/2012. (JKS)
September 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 109 Order on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or, Alternatively, for Evidentiary Limits (Dkt. 74). (See Order for details.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 9/12/2012. c/m (TMA)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OYEBADE v. BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADENIRAN OYEBADE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?