COLEMAN v. CURRY et al
Plaintiff: WAYDE COLEMAN
Defendant: PAUL R CIESIELSKI, TERRY CURRY, INDIANAPOLIS METROPOLITAN POLICE (IMPD), DENNY RANDALL JASON and REBECCA MEYER
Case Number: 1:2011cv01256
Filed: September 16, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Office: Indianapolis Office
Presiding Judge: Denise K. LaRue
Presiding Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ENTRY on Motions for Relief from Judgment. Mr. Coleman's 81 Motion for Relief from Judgment and 83 Motion Requesting the Court to Revisit the Dismissal of Plaintiff's Claim of Malicious Prosecution are DENIED. No relief from judgment under Rule 60(b) is warranted. (See Entry). Copy mailed. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 4/3/2014. (MAC)
October 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER denying 79 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 10/23/2013 (copy sent to Wayde Coleman) (CBU)
September 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ENTRY DISCUSSING CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT - Mr. Coleman has not identified a genuine issue of material fact as to his claims in this case, and the Defendants are entitled to judgment as a matter of law. Therefore, Mr. Coleman's Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. 55 ) is DENIED and Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. 62 ) is GRANTED. Judgment consistent with this Entry shall now issue. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 9/16/2013. Copy Mailed. (JD)
August 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ENTRY denying 73 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 8/19/2013. Copy Mailed. (JD)
April 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting 45 Motion to Quash. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 4/5/2013. Copy Mailed. (JD)
November 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting 36 and 37 Motion to Quash. However the requests for a protective order are denied. If Coleman formulates a request for documents that is more restricted, he may serve it and the Board should respond appropriately as governed by the FRCP. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 11/16/2012 Ocopy mailed to Wayde Coleman) (CBU)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COLEMAN v. CURRY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAUL R CIESIELSKI
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Haley
Represented By: Beth Ann Dale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TERRY CURRY
Represented By: Beth Ann Dale
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Haley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDIANAPOLIS METROPOLITAN POLICE (IMPD)
Represented By: Beth Ann Dale
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Haley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DENNY RANDALL JASON
Represented By: Beth Ann Dale
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Haley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REBECCA MEYER
Represented By: Beth Ann Dale
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Haley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WAYDE COLEMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?