HARGETT v. CORRECTIONAL MEDICAL SERVICES, INC. et al
Plaintiff: JAMES B. HARGETT
Defendant: DR. CHARLES R. ZIMONT, DANIEL S. MIHALO, DR. MICHAEL MITCHEFF, DAVID CLARK, CORRECTIONAL MEDICAL SERVICES, INC., MICHELLE L. HARRIS and INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTION
Case Number: 1:2011cv01316
Filed: September 28, 2011
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Office: Indianapolis Office
Presiding Judge: Denise K. LaRue
Presiding Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER denying 190 Defendant's Motion for Attorney Fees - Defendants are reminded that discovery is meant to be a cooperative endeavor, requiring minimal judicial intervention. See Airtex Corp. v. Shelley Radiant Ceiling Co., 536 F.2d 145, 155 (7th Cir. 1976). Had defense counsel promptly responded to Mr. Hargett's inquiries regarding the location and format of produced emails, or even proactively explained the confusing nature of the email formatting at the outset of its pr oduction, this discovery dispute could have been avoided. For these reasons, the Court concludes that Plaintiff's motion was substantially justified pursuant to Rule 37(a)(5)(B) and DENIES Defendants' Motion for Attorney's Fees. [Filing No. 190 .]. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 6/3/2014. (JKS)
April 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER - Mr. Hargett's objection, dkt. 52 , to the Magistrate Judge's report about the IDOC's Motion to Dismiss, dkt. 21 , is OVERRULED. The IDOC's motion to dismiss is GRANTED with respect to the § 1983 claim and GRANT ED with respect to state-law claims, but without prejudice to Mr. Hargett's ability to specifically plead state-law claims. Accordingly, Mr. Hargett's § 1983 claim against the IDOC is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and Mr. Hargett's s tate-law claims against the IDOC are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Mr. Hargett's objection, dkt. 50 , to the Magistrate Judge's report about Dr. Zimont's Motion to Dismiss, dkt. 23 , is OVERRULED IN PART. Dr. Zimont's motion to dismiss is DENIED with respect to the § 1983 claim and GRANTED with respect to Mr. Hargett's medical malpractice action against Dr. Zimont for actions or inactions that occurred after Dr. Zimont became a qualified health care provider on August 17, 2009. If Mr. Hargett can assert a plausible claim for the actions or inactions of Dr. Zimont that occurred before August 17, 2009, he may do so in his amended pleading. Mr. Hargett's objection, dkt. 51 , to the Magistrate Judge� 39;s report about Dr. Mitcheff's Motion to Dismiss, dkt. 31 , is OVERRULED. Dr. Mitcheff's motion to dismiss is DENIED with respect to the § 1983 claim and GRANTED with respect to Mr. Hargett's medical malpractice claim agains t Dr. Mitcheff, who was a qualified health care provider at all relevant times. The parties are ORDERED to confer with the Magistrate Judge within ten days to establish a deadline for Mr. Hargett to file an amended complaint consistent with this ruling. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 4/20/2012.(JKS)
March 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 48 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 31 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by MICHAEL MITCHEFF. Signed by Magistrate Judge Denise K. LaRue on 3/1/2012.(MAC)
February 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 21 MOTION to Dismiss filed by INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Denise K. LaRue on 2/27/2012.(MAC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HARGETT v. CORRECTIONAL MEDICAL SERVICES, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. CHARLES R. ZIMONT
Represented By: Jarrod Alvin Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIEL S. MIHALO
Represented By: Jarrod Alvin Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. MICHAEL MITCHEFF
Represented By: James F. Bleeke
Represented By: Jeb Adam Crandall
Represented By: Christopher D. Simpkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID CLARK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORRECTIONAL MEDICAL SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: Christopher D. Simpkins
Represented By: Jeb Adam Crandall
Represented By: James F. Bleeke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHELLE L. HARRIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTION
Represented By: Corinne T.W. Gilchrist
Represented By: Don R. Hostetler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES B. HARGETT
Represented By: Caroline B. Briggs
Represented By: John Kenneth Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?