SMITH v. INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, CORIZON et al
Plaintiff: |
ERIC SMITH |
Defendant: |
INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, CORIZON and DOE DEFENDANTS |
Case Number: |
1:2012cv00159 |
Filed: |
February 6, 2012 |
Court: |
U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana |
Office: |
Indianapolis Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Mark J. Dinsmore |
Presiding Judge: |
Tanya Walton Pratt |
Nature of Suit: |
Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition) |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act |
Jury Demanded By: |
Defendant |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 22, 2014 |
Filing
167
ENTRY denying 164 Plaintiff's Motion to Correct Error because Mr. Smith has failed to show any error. **SEE ENTRY FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION**. Copy Mailed. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 9/22/2014. (MGG)
|
August 28, 2014 |
Filing
162
ORDER granting Defendant's 117 Motion for Summary Judgment and Defendant's 126 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying Plaintiff's 138 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. Mr. Smith has not presented evidence sufficient to create a genuine issue of fact with respect to any of his claims. Judgment consistent with this Entry and with the stipulation filed on August 27, 2013, shall now issue. **SEE ORDER** Copy mailed. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 8/28/2014. (ADH)
|
October 11, 2013 |
Filing
132
ENTRY - The plaintiff's motion for discovery extension and for enlargement of time to respond to the defendants' motions for summary judgment (Dkt. 129 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The plaintiff's request for additiona l time to take expert depositions is DENIED, as further explained in paragraph 2 of this Entry. The plaintiff shall have additional time, through November 12, 2013, in which to respond to both motions for summary judgment. The plaintiff's mot ion for order to leave prison, for appointment of counsel, or to depose witnesses, requests the Court to order one of three alternative options to assist him in obtaining expert testimony to use in opposition of the defendants' motions for summary judgment (Dkt. 130 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 10/11/2013. Copy mailed. (JD)
|
August 19, 2013 |
Filing
113
ENTRY denying 112 Motion for Reconsideration re 109 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 8/19/2013. Copy Mailed. (JD)
|
September 5, 2012 |
Filing
57
ENTRY - The amended complaint has been screened and shall proceed as submitted. The clerk is designated to issue and serve process on the defendants Bruce Lemmon, A. Baker, Kim Don and Michael Mitcheff. Defendant Corizon has appeared by counsel and shall have through October 4, 2012, in which to answer or otherwise respond to the amended complaint. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 9/5/2012. Copies Mailed.(JD)
|
August 22, 2012 |
Filing
56
ENTRY Discussing Selected Matters - Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration (dkt. no. 53 ), Motion to Appoint Counsel (dkt. no. 54 ) and Motion to Appoint Counsel for Purposes of Obtaining Discovery for Preparation of Summary Judgment (dkt. no. 55 ) are DENIED. *SEE ENTRY*. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 8/22/2012. Copy Mailed. (JD)
|
March 5, 2012 |
Filing
11
Entry Discussing Motion to Remand - Plaintiff's 10 Objection to the Removal and Motion to Remand is DENIED. The clerk shall change the Nature of Suit code from 440 to 555. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 3/5/2012. (JD)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?