BLACKMAN v. BUTTS
Petitioner: NAJEE SABREE Q. BLACKMAN
Respondent: KEITH BUTTS
Case Number: 1:2012cv00540
Filed: April 24, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Office: Indianapolis Office
Presiding Judge: Denise K. LaRue
Presiding Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ENTRY Denying Extension of Time to File Notice of Appeal. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 5/28/2013. c/m (cc: USCA) (TMA)
January 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ENTRY - The petition for a writ of habeas corpus must be denied and the action dismissed. Judgment consistent with this Entry shall now issue. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 1/2/2013. Copy Mailed.(JD)
September 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ENTRY denying 18 Motion for Leave to Conduct Discovery and MOTION for Evidentiary Hearing. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 9/24/2012. Copy Mailed. (JD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BLACKMAN v. BUTTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: NAJEE SABREE Q. BLACKMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: KEITH BUTTS
Represented By: Linda Sue Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?